Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2812 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Springer, et al. H.B. No. 2812
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the limit on junior college courses that a high school
 student may enroll in for dual credit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.008(f), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *