Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2851 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin) H.B. No. 2851
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2015;
 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the limitation on the liability of the nonprofit
 corporation established by the Texas Public Finance Authority to
 issue revenue bonds for open-enrollment charter schools to provide
 educational facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 53.351(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The Texas Public Finance Authority shall appoint the
 directors of the corporation in consultation with the commissioner
 of education and subject to the approval of the
 governor.  Directors serve without compensation but are entitled
 to reimbursement for travel expenses incurred in attending board
 meetings.  The board shall meet at least once a year.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 53, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 53.352 to read as follows:
 Sec. 53.352.  LIMITATION ON LIABILITY OF CORPORATION. A
 director, officer, or employee of the nonprofit corporation
 established by the Texas Public Finance Authority under Section
 53.351 is not personally liable:
 (1)  for damage, loss, or injury resulting from the
 performance of the person's duties under Section 53.351; or
 (2)  on any commitment or agreement executed on behalf
 of the corporation under Section 53.351.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *