Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2861 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2861


 AN ACT
 relating to an optional procedure for the issuance of a permit by
 the City of Laredo for the movement of oversize or overweight
 vehicles carrying cargo in Webb County; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 623, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter T to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER T.  WEBB COUNTY PERMITS
 Sec. 623.381.  OPTIONAL PROCEDURE. This subchapter provides
 an optional procedure for the issuance of a permit by the City of
 Laredo for the movement of oversize or overweight vehicles carrying
 cargo on certain roadways located in Webb County.
 Sec. 623.382.  ISSUANCE OF PERMITS. (a)  The commission may
 authorize the City of Laredo to issue permits for the movement of
 oversize or overweight vehicles carrying cargo in Webb County on
 the following roadways:
 (1)  Farm-to-Market Road 1472 between its intersection
 with State Highway Loop 20 and the northernmost of its
 intersections with World Trade Center Loop;
 (2)  Farm-to-Market Road 1472 between the northernmost
 of its intersections with World Trade Center Loop and its
 intersection with Hachar Loop, if the Hachar Loop project in Webb
 County is constructed;
 (3)  Hachar Loop between its intersection with
 Farm-to-Market Road 1472 and its intersection with Interstate
 Highway 35, if the Hachar Loop project in Webb County is
 constructed; and
 (4)  Beltway Parkway between its intersection with
 Hachar Loop and its intersection with Interstate Highway 35, if the
 Hachar Loop project in Webb County is constructed.
 (b)  In addition to the roadways described by Subsection (a),
 the City of Laredo may designate and issue permits for the movement
 of oversize or overweight vehicles carrying cargo in Webb County on
 roadways under the city's jurisdiction and control.
 Sec. 623.383.  SURETY BOND. The commission may require the
 City of Laredo to execute, at its own expense, a surety bond payable
 to the Texas Department of Transportation in an amount of not less
 than $500,000 for costs of maintenance for the roadways described
 by Section 623.382(a).
 Sec. 623.384.  PERMIT FEES. (a) The City of Laredo may
 collect a fee for permits issued under this subchapter. Except as
 otherwise provided by this subsection, the maximum amount of the
 fee may not exceed $200 per trip. On September 1 of each year, the
 city may adjust the maximum fee amount as necessary to reflect the
 percentage change during the preceding year in the Consumer Price
 Index for All Urban Consumers (CPI-U), U.S. City Average, published
 monthly by the United States Bureau of Labor Statistics or its
 successor in function.
 (b)  Fees collected under Subsection (a) may be used only for
 the operation and maintenance of the roadways described by or
 designated under Section 623.382 and for the City of
 Laredo's administrative costs, which may not exceed 15 percent of
 the fees collected.
 (c)  The distribution of the fees collected under Subsection
 (a) less the City of Laredo's administrative costs must be
 distributed between the state and the city based on lane mile
 calculations between on and off system roadways subject to this
 subchapter. Lane mile calculations must be adjusted on a biannual
 basis.
 (d)  The City of Laredo shall send the state's portion of the
 fees collected under Subsection (a) to the comptroller for deposit
 to the credit of the state highway fund. Fees deposited in the
 state highway fund under this section are exempt from the
 application of Section 403.095, Government Code.
 Sec. 623.385.  PERMIT REQUIREMENTS. (a) A permit issued
 under this subchapter must include:
 (1)  the name of the applicant;
 (2)  the date of issuance;
 (3)  the signature of the designated agent for the City
 of Laredo;
 (4)  a statement of the kind of cargo being
 transported, the maximum weight and dimensions of the equipment,
 and the kind and weight of each commodity to be transported;
 (5)  a statement:
 (A)  that the gross weight of the vehicle for
 which a permit is issued may not exceed 125,000 pounds; and
 (B)  of any other condition on which the permit is
 issued;
 (6)  a statement that the cargo may be transported in
 Webb County only over the roadways described by or designated under
 Section 623.382;
 (7)  a statement that the permit does not authorize the
 transportation of the cargo on an interstate highway; and
 (8)  the location where the cargo was loaded.
 (b)  The City of Laredo shall report to the department all
 permits issued under this subchapter.
 Sec. 623.386.  TIME OF MOVEMENT. A permit issued under this
 subchapter must specify the time during which movement authorized
 by the permit is allowed.
 Sec. 623.387.  SPEED LIMIT. Movement authorized by a permit
 issued under this subchapter may not exceed the posted speed limit
 or 55 miles per hour, whichever is less. A violation of this
 provision constitutes a moving violation.
 Sec. 623.388.  ENFORCEMENT. The Department of Public Safety
 has authority to enforce this subchapter.
 Sec. 623.389.  PAVEMENT MANAGEMENT PLAN. The Texas
 Department of Transportation shall create a pavement management
 plan for the roadways described by Section 623.382(a).
 Sec. 623.390.  RULES. The commission may adopt rules
 necessary to implement this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  The City of Laredo may adjust the maximum fee
 amount as provided by Section 623.384, Transportation Code, as
 added by this Act, beginning September 1, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2861 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 1, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2861 on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 3,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2861 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor