Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2877 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 19, 2015      TO: Honorable Dan Flynn, Chair, House Committee on Pensions      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2877 by Stephenson (Relating to peace officers who are members of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would exempt members of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas (TRS), who are employed as peace officers, from certain retirement eligibility standards and benefit provisions that apply to other members of TRS. The bill would provide unreduced retirement eligibility at the Rule of 80 (age plus years of creditable service) with a minimum age of 60 for TRS members that are peace officers who were not vested as of August 31, 2014 or who became new members on or after September 1, 2014. Currently, the same members satisfy the requirements for an unreduced retirement when they meet the Rule of 80 with a minimum age of 62. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2015.   The TRS actuary analyzed the actuarial impact and indicates the bill would result in an increase to the normal cost of the system from 10.43 percent to 10.44 percent; an increase to the unfunded actuarial accrued liability (UAAL) of $2 million, from $32,104 million to $32,106 million; and an increased funding period to amortize the UAAL from 29.3 years to 29.4 years. The actuary adds that since the funding period would not exceed 30 years by one or more years, passage of the bill would be allowable under current statutes. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:323 Teacher Retirement System   LBB Staff:  UP, AG, AM, PFe    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 19, 2015





  TO: Honorable Dan Flynn, Chair, House Committee on Pensions      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2877 by Stephenson (Relating to peace officers who are members of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Dan Flynn, Chair, House Committee on Pensions
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2877 by Stephenson (Relating to peace officers who are members of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.), As Introduced

 Honorable Dan Flynn, Chair, House Committee on Pensions 

 Honorable Dan Flynn, Chair, House Committee on Pensions 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2877 by Stephenson (Relating to peace officers who are members of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.), As Introduced

HB2877 by Stephenson (Relating to peace officers who are members of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would exempt members of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas (TRS), who are employed as peace officers, from certain retirement eligibility standards and benefit provisions that apply to other members of TRS. The bill would provide unreduced retirement eligibility at the Rule of 80 (age plus years of creditable service) with a minimum age of 60 for TRS members that are peace officers who were not vested as of August 31, 2014 or who became new members on or after September 1, 2014. Currently, the same members satisfy the requirements for an unreduced retirement when they meet the Rule of 80 with a minimum age of 62. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2015.   The TRS actuary analyzed the actuarial impact and indicates the bill would result in an increase to the normal cost of the system from 10.43 percent to 10.44 percent; an increase to the unfunded actuarial accrued liability (UAAL) of $2 million, from $32,104 million to $32,106 million; and an increased funding period to amortize the UAAL from 29.3 years to 29.4 years. The actuary adds that since the funding period would not exceed 30 years by one or more years, passage of the bill would be allowable under current statutes.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 323 Teacher Retirement System

323 Teacher Retirement System

LBB Staff: UP, AG, AM, PFe

 UP, AG, AM, PFe