Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2904 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 24, 2015      TO: Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2904 by Davis, Sarah (Relating to dismissal of certain actions for an asbestos-related or silica-related injury.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Civil Practice and Remedies Code regarding the dismissal of asbestos or silica-related injury claims by the Multidistrict Litigation pretrial court. The bill would extend the date for which actions filed before August 31, 2005 would be dismissed by the court from on or before August 31, 2015 to on or before December 31, 2015. Based on the analysis of the Office of Court Administration, duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council   LBB Staff:  UP, FR, GDz    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 24, 2015





  TO: Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2904 by Davis, Sarah (Relating to dismissal of certain actions for an asbestos-related or silica-related injury.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2904 by Davis, Sarah (Relating to dismissal of certain actions for an asbestos-related or silica-related injury.), As Introduced

 Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Honorable John T. Smithee, Chair, House Committee on Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2904 by Davis, Sarah (Relating to dismissal of certain actions for an asbestos-related or silica-related injury.), As Introduced

HB2904 by Davis, Sarah (Relating to dismissal of certain actions for an asbestos-related or silica-related injury.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Civil Practice and Remedies Code regarding the dismissal of asbestos or silica-related injury claims by the Multidistrict Litigation pretrial court. The bill would extend the date for which actions filed before August 31, 2005 would be dismissed by the court from on or before August 31, 2015 to on or before December 31, 2015. Based on the analysis of the Office of Court Administration, duties and responsibilities associated with implementing the provisions of the bill could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council

LBB Staff: UP, FR, GDz

 UP, FR, GDz