Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2950 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2950


 AN ACT
 relating to the Task Force on Infectious Disease Preparedness and
 Response.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 81, Health and Safety Code, as amended by
 S.B. No. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015,
 is amended by adding Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J. TASK FORCE ON INFECTIOUS DISEASE PREPAREDNESS AND
 RESPONSE
 Sec. 81.401.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "task force"
 means the Task Force on Infectious Disease Preparedness and
 Response.
 Sec. 81.402.  PURPOSE AND FINDINGS. The legislature finds
 that:
 (1)  infectious diseases are responsible for more
 deaths worldwide than any other single cause;
 (2)  the State of Texas has a responsibility to
 safeguard and protect the health and well-being of its citizens
 from the spread of infectious diseases;
 (3)  on September 30, 2014, the first case of Ebola
 diagnosed in the United States occurred in Dallas, Texas;
 (4)  addressing infectious diseases requires the
 coordination and cooperation of multiple governmental entities at
 the local, state, and federal levels;
 (5)  public health and medical preparedness and
 response guidelines are crucial to protect the safety and welfare
 of our citizens; and
 (6)  Texas has nationally recognized infectious
 disease experts and other highly trained professionals across the
 state with the experience needed to minimize any potential risk to
 the people of Texas.
 Sec. 81.403.  TASK FORCE; DUTIES.  (a)  The Task Force on
 Infectious Disease Preparedness and Response is created as an
 advisory panel to the governor.
 (b)  The task force shall:
 (1)  provide expert, evidence-based assessments,
 protocols, and recommendations related to state responses to
 infectious diseases, including Ebola; and
 (2)  serve as a reliable and transparent source of
 information and education for Texas leadership and citizens.
 Sec. 81.404.  APPOINTMENT OF MEMBERS; TERMS.  (a)  The
 governor may appoint members of the task force as necessary,
 including members from relevant state agencies, members with
 expertise in infectious diseases and other issues involved in the
 prevention of the spread of infectious diseases, and members from
 institutions of higher education in this state. The governor shall
 appoint to the task force:
 (1)  at least one member who is a county judge of a
 county with a population of less than 100,000;
 (2)  at least one member who is a county judge of a
 county with a population of 100,000 or more;
 (3)  at least one member who is a representative of a
 local health authority serving a rural area;
 (4)  at least one member who is a representative of a
 local health authority serving an urban area;
 (5)  at least one member who is a licensed nurse; and
 (6)  at least one member who is emergency medical
 services personnel, as defined by Section 773.003.
 (b)  The governor shall appoint a director of the task force
 from among the members of the task force.
 (c)  The governor may fill any vacancy that occurs on the
 task force and may appoint additional members as needed.
 (d)  Members of the task force serve at the pleasure of the
 governor.
 (e)  A state or local employee appointed to the task force
 shall perform any duties required by the task force in addition to
 the regular duties of the employee.
 Sec. 81.405.  REPORTS. The task force may make written
 reports on its findings and recommendations, including legislative
 recommendations, to the governor and legislature.
 Sec. 81.406.  MEETINGS. (a)  The task force shall meet at
 times and locations as determined by the director of the task force.
 (b)  The task force may meet telephonically in accordance
 with Section 551.125(b)(3), Government Code.
 (c)  The task force may hold public hearings to gather
 information. The task force shall endeavor to meet in various parts
 of the state to encourage local input.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Section 551.144, Government Code, or
 any other law, the task force may hold a closed meeting to discuss
 matters that are confidential by state or federal law or to ensure
 public security or law enforcement needs. A closed meeting held as
 provided by this subsection must be held as otherwise provided by
 Chapter 551, Government Code.
 Sec. 81.407.  ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. State agencies with
 members on the task force shall provide administrative support for
 the task force.
 Sec. 81.408.  REIMBURSEMENT. Task force members serve
 without compensation and are not entitled to reimbursement for
 travel expenses.
 Sec. 81.409.  INFECTIOUS DISEASE EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
 FACILITIES AT HEALTH CARE-RELATED INSTITUTIONS. (a) The commission
 may enter into contracts or agreements to assist in the
 establishment of infectious disease emergency preparedness
 facilities at health care-related institutions in this state. The
 contracts or agreements may provide for payment by the commission
 to develop and equip infectious disease emergency preparedness
 facilities at health care-related institutions in this state, as
 well as for materials, equipment, services, or other items the
 commission considers necessary to implement this section.
 (b)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  On the effective date of this Act, a member
 serving on the Task Force on Infectious Disease Preparedness and
 Response created by executive order of the governor continues to
 serve on the Task Force on Infectious Disease Preparedness and
 Response under Subchapter J, Chapter 81, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (b)  As soon as practicable after the effective date of this
 Act, the governor shall make any appointments to the Task Force on
 Infectious Disease Preparedness and Response required under
 Subchapter J, Chapter 81, Health and Safety Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2950 was passed by the House on May
 13, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 3, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2950 on May 29, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 1,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2950 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor