Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2965 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Gonzales, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2965
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 25, 2015, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2965 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to administrative support positions with the Texas
 Military Department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 437, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 437.2121 to read as follows:
 Sec. 437.2121.  EXTENDED STATE ACTIVE DUTY SERVICE FOR
 ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. (a) The adjutant general may hire service
 members of the Texas military forces to fill state military
 positions with the department as authorized by the General
 Appropriations Act. A service member hired under this section is
 considered to be on extended state active duty service.
 (b)  A service member called to extended state active duty
 service under this section is entitled to the benefits and paid
 leave generally provided to state employees.
 (c)  The adjutant general shall establish and the department
 shall maintain the criteria for activating a service member under
 this section.
 (d)  A state military position may have a limited term with a
 defined end date or may be a continuing position without a defined
 end date.
 (e)  As soon as practicable before the end of each state
 fiscal year, the department shall notify each service member called
 to extended state active duty service under this section whether
 the department will continue the service member's state military
 position for the next state fiscal year.
 (f)  The department shall consult with the classification
 officer, as authorized by Chapter 654, to develop a state salary
 structure classification applicable to service members called to
 extended state active duty service under this section. The salary
 structure classification may allow for automatic salary increases
 based on the service member's military rank and years of service.
 The department may use the salary structure classification
 established under this subsection before it is adopted in the
 General Appropriations Act. This subsection expires August 31,
 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *