H.B. No. 2965 AN ACT relating to administrative support positions with the Texas Military Department. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 437, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 437.2121 to read as follows: Sec. 437.2121. EXTENDED STATE ACTIVE DUTY SERVICE FOR ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT. (a) The adjutant general may hire service members of the Texas military forces to fill state military positions with the department as authorized by the General Appropriations Act. A service member hired under this section is considered to be on extended state active duty service. (b) A service member called to extended state active duty service under this section is entitled to the benefits and paid leave generally provided to state employees. (c) The adjutant general shall establish and the department shall maintain the criteria for activating a service member under this section. (d) A state military position may have a limited term with a defined end date or may be a continuing position without a defined end date. (e) As soon as practicable before the end of each state fiscal year, the department shall notify each service member called to extended state active duty service under this section whether the department will continue the service member's state military position for the next state fiscal year. (f) The department shall consult with the classification officer, as authorized by Chapter 654, to develop a state salary structure classification applicable to service members called to extended state active duty service under this section. The salary structure classification may allow for automatic salary increases based on the service member's military rank and years of service. The department may use the salary structure classification established under this subsection before it is adopted in the General Appropriations Act. This subsection expires August 31, 2017. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2965 was passed by the House on May 11, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 1, 1 present, not voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 2965 on May 28, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 1, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2965 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor