Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2968 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R9946 YDB-D
 By: Guillen H.B. No. 2968


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Alamo preservation fund and the establishment of an
 Alamo preservation fund advisory committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 31, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 31.4545 and 31.4546 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 31.4545.  ALAMO PRESERVATION FUND. (a) The Alamo
 preservation fund is a special fund in the state treasury outside
 the general revenue fund as established by Section 49-q, Article
 III, Texas Constitution.
 (b)  The land office shall manage the Alamo preservation fund
 and may accept a gift, grant, or donation of money, securities,
 services, or property to restore, preserve, maintain, operate, and
 develop the Alamo complex.
 (c)  The land office may spend money from the Alamo
 preservation fund only for the restoration, preservation,
 maintenance, operation, or development of the Alamo complex and
 only in amounts that are less than or equal to the amounts received
 by the land office from federal, local, or private sources, which
 the land office may spend for the same purposes.
 (d)  The land office shall retain not less than $25 million
 in an account in the Alamo preservation fund to be known as the
 Alamo operation and maintenance trust account. The land office may
 spend the interest and other earnings from the trust account for the
 operation, maintenance, and improvement of the Alamo complex.
 Sec. 31.4546.  ALAMO PRESERVATION FUND ADVISORY COMMITTEE.
 (a) The Alamo preservation fund advisory committee is established
 to advise the land office on expenditures of money from the Alamo
 preservation fund. The advisory committee consists of 15 members
 appointed as follows:
 (1)  three members appointed by the governor;
 (2)  three members appointed by the lieutenant
 governor;
 (3)  three members appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives;
 (4)  three members appointed by the commissioner of the
 land office;
 (5)  two members appointed by the San Antonio City
 Council; and
 (6)  one member appointed by the Bexar County
 Commissioners Court.
 (b)  Members of the advisory committee serve staggered
 three-year terms with the terms of five members expiring January 1
 of each year.
 (c)  The commissioner of the land office shall appoint a
 member to serve as presiding officer of the advisory committee.
 (d)  The advisory committee shall make recommendations to
 the land office on the best use of money in the Alamo preservation
 fund to create a world-class site to educate visitors on the history
 and importance of the Alamo in this state's fight for independence,
 to honor the people who lost their lives at the Alamo, and to
 develop the complex and surrounding grounds, including providing
 education and museum facilities, financing studies and planning,
 providing architectural services, acquiring land or buildings, and
 constructing facilities.
 (e)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 advisory committee.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, as required by
 Section 31.4546, Natural Resources Code, as added by this Act:
 (1)  the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the commissioner of the General Land
 Office shall each appoint three members to the Alamo preservation
 fund advisory committee and each designate one of their appointed
 members to a term expiring January 1, 2017, one to a term expiring
 January 1, 2018, and one to a term expiring January 1, 2019;
 (2)  the San Antonio City Council shall appoint two
 members to the Alamo preservation fund advisory committee and
 designate one member to a term expiring January 1, 2017, and one to
 a term expiring January 1, 2018; and
 (3)  the Bexar County Commissioners Court shall appoint
 one member to the Alamo preservation fund advisory committee to a
 term expiring January 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect December 1, 2015, but only
 if the constitutional amendment to establish the Alamo preservation
 fund and make a one-time transfer of money from the economic
 stabilization fund to the Alamo preservation fund is approved by
 the voters. If that amendment is not approved by the voters, this
 Act has no effect.