Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2968 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/31/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 2968


 AN ACT
 relating to the preservation of the Alamo complex and surrounding
 area and to the Alamo Preservation Advisory Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter I, Chapter 31, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 31.450 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.450.  FINDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF UNDERSTANDING. (a)
 The legislature finds that:
 (1)  the Alamo has played an important role in the
 history of this state and continues to be a symbol of liberty and
 freedom for this state;
 (2)  this state wants to honor the individuals whose
 lives were lost at the Alamo;
 (3)  the entire history of the Alamo, from the time the
 Alamo was established as a mission until the present, should be
 recognized; and
 (4)  the Alamo is a world-class destination that
 provides a place of remembrance and education.
 (b)  The land office shall enter into a memorandum of
 understanding with the City of San Antonio to coordinate the
 planning and development of improvements to the Alamo complex and
 the area immediately surrounding the complex.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 31.455(a) and (b), Natural Resources
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The land office may establish an Alamo Preservation
 Advisory Board to provide advice, proposals, and recommendations
 to:
 (1)  promote the development of a world-class site to
 educate visitors on the history and importance of the Alamo in this
 state's fight for independence and to honor the people who lost
 their lives at the Alamo;
 (2)  promote and support the Alamo complex;
 (3) [(2)]  provide the resources and support necessary
 to advance the understanding and education of current and future
 generations on the historical significance and factual record of
 the Alamo complex;
 (4) [(3)]  inspire virtues of honor and Texas pride;
 (5) [(4)]  preserve the memory and achievement of
 individuals who served at the Alamo and provide a fitting tribute to
 the heroism of the people who paid the ultimate sacrifice for
 freedom and of the noble men and women of this state who have served
 in the armed forces or died while serving in the armed forces to
 ensure the freedom of the people of this state;
 (6)  provide educational and museum facilities [(5)
 promote and provide] for the preservation, perpetuation,
 appropriate publication, and display of manuscripts, books,
 relics, pictures, oral histories, and all other items and
 information related to the history of the Alamo complex and of this
 state that preserve the historical character of the Alamo shrine;
 and
 (7) [(6)]  promote, counsel, and provide support to
 governmental and private organizations that are committed to
 objectives similar to the objectives described in this subsection.
 (b)  The advisory board is composed of:
 (1)  the commissioner or the commissioner's designee,
 who serves as the presiding officer of the advisory board;
 (2)  a designee appointed by the governor;
 (3)  a representative of the Alamo Endowment, appointed
 by the commissioner [the president general of the Daughters of the
 Republic of Texas];
 (4)  the director of the Alamo [current Alamo
 chairperson of the Daughters of the Republic of Texas];
 (5)  [the immediate past Alamo chairperson of the
 Daughters of the Republic of Texas;
 [(6)]  the Alamo curator;
 (6) [(7)]  one representative of the Texas Historical
 Commission;
 (7)  a designee appointed by the county judge of
 [(8)  the president of the] Bexar County [Historical Commission];
 [and]
 (8)  a designee appointed by the mayor [(9)     one
 representative who serves as a member] of the City of San Antonio;
 [Office of Historic Preservation]
 (9)  a designee appointed by the commissioner
 representing the local travel and tourism industry and the
 businesses and landholders from the area immediately surrounding
 the Alamo complex;
 (10)  one member of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; and
 (11)  one senator appointed by the lieutenant governor.
 SECTION 3.  (a) The term of a member serving on the Alamo
 Preservation Advisory Board immediately before the effective date
 of this Act whose position on the board is abolished by the changes
 in law made by this Act expires on the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  As soon as practicable after the effective date of this
 Act, each appointing official shall appoint members to the Alamo
 Preservation Advisory Board as required by Section 31.455, Natural
 Resources Code, as amended by this Act.
 (c)  As soon as practicable after the effective date of this
 Act, the General Land Office shall enter into a memorandum of
 understanding with the City of San Antonio as required by Section
 31.450(b), Natural Resources Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2968 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 13, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2968 on May 28, 2015, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2968 on May 31, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 124,
 Nays 19, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2968 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2968 on May 30, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor