Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3078 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 3078
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 14, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3078 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an advisory committee to recommend a
 uniform pre-nursing curriculum for undergraduate professional
 nursing programs offered by public institutions of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0261 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0261.  UNIFORM PRE-NURSING CURRICULUM ADVISORY
 COMMITTEE. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Pre-nursing curriculum" means a curriculum
 designed to prepare students for enrollment in an undergraduate
 professional nursing program.
 (2)  "Undergraduate professional nursing program"
 means an educational program for preparing students for initial
 licensure as registered nurses.
 (b)  The Uniform Pre-Nursing Curriculum Advisory Committee
 is created to develop and make recommendations on a uniform
 pre-nursing curriculum for undergraduate professional nursing
 programs offered by institutions of higher education. The advisory
 committee consists of at least 16 members as follows:
 (1)  the commissioner of higher education or the
 commissioner's designee;
 (2)  the executive director of the Texas Board of
 Nursing or the executive director's designee;
 (3)  two representatives of professional nursing
 associations, appointed by the board; and
 (4)  a representative from the undergraduate
 professional nursing programs offered by at least 12 institutions
 of higher education, appointed by the board in accordance with the
 following:
 (A)  at least three representatives must be from
 junior colleges;
 (B)  at least three representatives must be from
 general academic teaching institutions; and
 (C)  at least three representatives must be from
 health science centers.
 (c)  The members of the advisory committee may not receive
 compensation for their service.
 (d)  The advisory committee shall assess, as of September 1,
 2015:
 (1)  the prerequisite courses that are required for
 each undergraduate professional nursing program in this state; and
 (2)  the ability of a student to use course credit
 earned at one institution of higher education to qualify for
 consideration for admission to an undergraduate professional
 nursing program offered by another institution of higher education.
 (e)  The advisory committee shall develop and make
 recommendations regarding the creation of a uniform pre-nursing
 curriculum.  Recommendations under this section must specify:
 (1)  the prerequisite courses that a student must
 complete to qualify for consideration for admission to each
 undergraduate professional nursing program offered by an
 institution of higher education; and
 (2)  the content for the courses under Subdivision (1).
 (f)  Not later than December 1, 2016, the advisory committee
 shall prepare and submit to the legislature and to each standing
 legislative committee with primary jurisdiction over higher
 education a report containing the committee's findings under this
 section, including the recommended uniform pre-nursing curriculum.
 (g)  This section expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board shall make the appointments to the
 Uniform Pre-Nursing Curriculum Advisory Committee required under
 Section 61.0261(b), Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *