Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3078 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R5415 JSL-D
 By: Darby H.B. No. 3078


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of an advisory committee to recommend a
 uniform pre-nursing curriculum for undergraduate professional
 nursing programs offered by public institutions of higher
 education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0261 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0261.  UNIFORM PRE-NURSING CURRICULUM ADVISORY
 COMMITTEE. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Pre-nursing curriculum" means a curriculum
 designed to prepare students for enrollment in an undergraduate
 professional nursing program.
 (2)  "Undergraduate professional nursing program"
 means an educational program for preparing students for initial
 licensure as registered nurses.
 (b)  The Uniform Pre-Nursing Curriculum Advisory Committee
 is created to develop and make recommendations on a uniform
 pre-nursing curriculum for undergraduate professional nursing
 programs offered by institutions of higher education. The advisory
 committee consists of at least nine members as follows:
 (1)  the commissioner of higher education or the
 commissioner's designee;
 (2)  the executive director of the Texas Board of
 Nursing or the executive director's designee;
 (3)  a representative of the Texas Nurses Association,
 appointed by the board; and
 (4)  a representative from the undergraduate
 professional nursing programs offered by at least six institutions
 of higher education, appointed by the board.
 (c)  The members of the advisory committee may not receive
 compensation for their service.
 (d)  The advisory committee shall develop and make
 recommendations on a uniform pre-nursing curriculum to serve as the
 prerequisite for gaining admission to each undergraduate
 professional nursing program offered by an institution of higher
 education. The uniform curriculum must specify the course content
 for the first 60 semester credit hours a student must take before
 gaining admission to an undergraduate professional nursing
 program.
 (e)  Not later than September 1, 2016, the advisory committee
 shall prepare and submit a report containing the committee's
 recommended uniform pre-nursing curriculum to the legislature and
 to each standing legislative committee with primary jurisdiction
 over higher education.
 (f)  This section expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board shall make the appointments to the
 Uniform Pre-Nursing Curriculum Advisory Committee required under
 Section 61.0261(b), Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.