Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3092 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 15, 2015      TO: Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Human Resources Code to require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to implement a pilot program to evaluate the feasibility and any associated benefits of providing protective services to elderly or disabled persons in imminent risk of abuse, neglect, or exploitation based on certain risk assessment criteria. DFPS would be required to implement the pilot by January 1, 2016 and is authorized to continue the pilot through August 31, 2017. The bill requires DFPS to submit a report of preliminary findings by December 15, 2016 and any additional findings by December 15, 2017.DFPS and the Health and Human Services Commission do not anticipate any significant fiscal impacts as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 529 Health and Human Services Commission   LBB Staff:  UP, NB, WP, SJ, VJC    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 15, 2015





  TO: Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 Honorable Richard Peña Raymond, Chair, House Committee on Human Services 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB3092 by Rose (Relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide protective services to certain persons determined to be at risk of future harm from abuse, neglect, or exploitation.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Human Resources Code to require the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to implement a pilot program to evaluate the feasibility and any associated benefits of providing protective services to elderly or disabled persons in imminent risk of abuse, neglect, or exploitation based on certain risk assessment criteria. DFPS would be required to implement the pilot by January 1, 2016 and is authorized to continue the pilot through August 31, 2017. The bill requires DFPS to submit a report of preliminary findings by December 15, 2016 and any additional findings by December 15, 2017.DFPS and the Health and Human Services Commission do not anticipate any significant fiscal impacts as a result of complying with the provisions of the bill.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: UP, NB, WP, SJ, VJC

 UP, NB, WP, SJ, VJC