Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3106 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huberty, Phelan (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 3106
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period of time allowed for appointment of a board of
 managers for a school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.112, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (f), at [At]
 the direction of the commissioner but not later than the second
 anniversary of the date the board of managers of a district was
 appointed, the board of managers shall order an election of members
 of the district board of trustees.  The election must be held on a
 uniform election date on which an election of district trustees may
 be held under Section 41.001, Election Code, that is at least 180
 days after the date the election was ordered.  On qualification of
 members for office, the board of trustees assumes all of the powers
 and duties assigned to a board of trustees by law, rule, or
 regulation.
 (f)  If, before the second anniversary of the date the board
 of managers of a district was appointed, the commissioner
 determines that insufficient progress has been made toward
 improving the academic or financial performance of the district,
 the commissioner may extend the authority of the board of managers
 for a period of up to two additional years.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *