Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3106 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/01/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3106


 AN ACT
 relating to the period of time allowed for appointment of a board of
 managers for a school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.112, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (f) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Except as otherwise provided by Subsection (f), at [At]
 the direction of the commissioner but not later than the second
 anniversary of the date the board of managers of a district was
 appointed, the board of managers shall order an election of members
 of the district board of trustees.  The election must be held on a
 uniform election date on which an election of district trustees may
 be held under Section 41.001, Election Code, that is at least 180
 days after the date the election was ordered.  On qualification of
 members for office, the board of trustees assumes all of the powers
 and duties assigned to a board of trustees by law, rule, or
 regulation.
 (f)  If, before the second anniversary of the date the board
 of managers of a district was appointed, the commissioner
 determines, after receiving local feedback, that insufficient
 progress has been made toward improving the academic or financial
 performance of the district, the commissioner may extend the
 authority of the board of managers for a period of up to two
 additional years.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3106 was passed by the House on May 7,
 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 125, Nays 15, 3 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 3106 on May 27, 2015, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 3106 on May 31, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 128,
 Nays 14, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3106 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 25, Nays
 5; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 3106 on May 31, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 25, Nays 6.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor