Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3121 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/23/2015

                    By: Thompson of Harris H.B. No. 3121
 (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3121 By:  Huffman


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of orders in a suit affecting the
 parent-child relationship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 157.001, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A motion for enforcement as provided in this chapter may
 be filed to enforce any provision of a temporary or [a] final order
 rendered in a suit [for conservatorship, child support, possession
 of or access to a child, or other provisions of a final order].
 (b)  The court may enforce by contempt any provision of a
 temporary or final order [for possession of and access to a child as
 provided in this chapter].
 (c)  The court may enforce a temporary or final order for
 child support as provided in this chapter or Chapter 158.
 (e)  For purposes of this section, "temporary order"
 includes a temporary restraining order, standing order,
 injunction, and any other temporary order rendered by a court.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 157.062(c) and (d), Family Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Notice of hearing on a motion for enforcement of a final
 [an existing] order providing for child support or possession of or
 access to a child, any provision of a final order rendered against a
 party who has already appeared in a suit under this title, or any
 provision of a temporary order shall be given to the respondent by
 personal service of a copy of the motion and notice not later than
 the 10th day before the date of the hearing. For purposes of this
 subsection, "temporary order" includes a temporary restraining
 order, standing order, injunction, and any other temporary order
 rendered by a court.
 (d)  If a motion for enforcement of a final order, other than
 a final order rendered against a party who has already appeared in a
 suit under this title, is joined with another claim:
 (1)  the hearing may not be held before 10 a.m. on the
 first Monday after the 20th day after the date of service; and
 (2)  the provisions of the Texas Rules of Civil
 Procedure applicable to the filing of an original lawsuit apply.
 SECTION 3.  Section 157.065(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  If a party has been ordered under Chapter 105 to provide
 the court and the state case registry with the party's current
 mailing address, notice of a hearing on a motion for enforcement of
 a final order may be served by mailing a copy of the notice to the
 respondent, together with a copy of the motion, by first class mail
 to the last mailing address of the respondent on file with the court
 and the registry.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 motion for enforcement that is filed on or after the effective date
 of this Act. A motion for enforcement filed before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 motion is filed, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *