Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB315 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Raymond, Spitzer, Burkett H.B. No. 315
 (Senate Sponsor - Huffines)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 315 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of "In God We Trust" specialty license
 plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.665 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.665.  IN GOD WE TRUST LICENSE PLATES. (a) The
 department shall issue specially designed license plates that
 include the words "In God We Trust."
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of the license plates
 shall be deposited to the credit of the general revenue fund and may
 be appropriated only to the Texas Veterans Commission.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *