Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3150 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Huberty, Hunter (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 3150
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 18, 2015, rereferred to
 Committee on Business and Commerce; May 24, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 24, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the calculation of taxable wages paid by a professional
 employer organization for purposes of the Texas Unemployment
 Compensation Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 91.044, Labor Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A license holder is the employer of a covered employee
 for purposes of Subtitle A, Title 4, and, except for wages subject
 to Section 91.032(c), for purposes of Chapter 61.
 (a-1)  A license holder may, in a calendar year during which
 an employee becomes a covered employee of the license holder, apply
 toward the maximum amount of taxable wages established in Section
 201.082(1) any wages paid to the employee in that calendar year by:
 (1)  the client; or
 (2)  another license holder under a prior professional
 employer services agreement with that client.
 (a-2)  In addition to any other reports required to be filed
 by law, a license holder shall report quarterly to the Texas
 Workforce Commission on a form prescribed by the Texas Workforce
 Commission the name, address, telephone number, federal income tax
 identification number, and classification code according to the
 North American Industry Classification System [as described in the
 "Standard Industrial Classification Manual" published by the
 United States Office of Management and Budget] of each client.
 SECTION 2.  Section 201.101, Labor Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 201.101.  CONFORMITY WITH FEDERAL STATUTES. If the
 United States secretary of labor holds that Section 91.044(a-1) or
 a provision of this subtitle does not conform with a federal
 statute, the commission may administer Section 91.044(a-1) or this
 subtitle, as applicable, to conform with the federal statute until
 the legislature meets in its next session and has an opportunity to
 amend the applicable law [this subtitle].
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to contributions and withholdings required under Subtitle A, Title
 4, Labor Code, due for employment services rendered on or after
 January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *