Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3167 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Simmons (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3167
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 25, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the governing bodies of certain local planning
 organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 391.006, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (d) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The governing body of a commission of a region that is
 consistent with the geographic boundaries of a state planning
 region shall offer an ex officio, nonvoting membership on the
 governing body to each [a] member of the legislature who represents
 a district located wholly or partly in the region of the commission.
 (d)  An ex officio member is not counted for purposes of
 determining a quorum.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *