Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB321 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/17/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Keough H.B. No. 321


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 A bill relating to the repeal of the franchise tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This act may be cited as the Business Tax Relief
 Act.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1(c), Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
 37.01, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2011, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
 37.02, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (d), Section
 171.002, Tax Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  Section 3, Chapter 286 (H.B. 4765), Acts of the
 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, as amended by Section
 37.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called
 Session, 2011, and which amended former Subsection (a), Section
 171.0021, Tax Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 5.  (a) Chapter 171, Tax Code, is repealed.
 (b)  A taxable entity that is subject to the franchise tax
 imposed under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on December 31, 2015, shall
 file a final franchise tax return and pay a transitional tax as
 required by this subsection on or before May 15, 2016. The
 transitional tax is equal to the tax the taxable entity would have
 paid in 2016 under Chapter 171, Tax Code, if Chapter 171, Tax Code,
 had not been repealed. The provisions of Chapter 171, Tax Code,
 relating to the computation and payment of the franchise tax remain
 in effect after the repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, by this section
 for the purposes of computing and paying the transitional tax
 required by this subsection.
 (c)  Chapter 171, Tax Code, and Subtitle B, Title 2, Tax
 Code, continue to apply to audits, deficiencies, redeterminations,
 and refunds of any tax due or collected under Chapter 171, including
 the tax due as provided by Subsection (b) of this section, until
 barred by limitations.
 (d)  The repeal of Chapter 171, Tax Code, does not affect:
 (1)  the status of a taxable entity that has had its
 corporate privileges, certificate of authority, certificate of
 organization, certificate of limited partnership, corporate
 charter, or registration revoked, suit filed against it, or a
 receiver appointed under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter;
 (2)  the ability of the comptroller, secretary of
 state, or attorney general to take action against a taxable entity
 under Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter for actions that took
 place before the repeal; or
 (3)  the right of a taxable entity to contest a
 forfeiture, revocation, lawsuit, or appointment of a receiver under
 Subchapter F, G, or H of that chapter.
 (e)  This section takes effect January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 171.0021 and 171.1016(d), Tax Code, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 7.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act applies only to a report originally due on or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 8.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect January 1, 2016.