Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3212 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/24/2015

                    By: King of Parker (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3212
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 24, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3212 By:  Whitmire


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 HuffmanX
 BurtonX
 CreightonX
 HinojosaX
 MenéndezX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to peace officer identification cards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 614.121, Government Code, as added by
 Chapter 938 (H.B. 3613), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2007, is amended by adding Subdivision (3-a) to read as
 follows:
 (3-a)  "Qualified retired law enforcement officer" has
 the meaning assigned by 18 U.S.C. Section 926C.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 614, Government Code, as
 added by Chapter 938 (H.B. 3613), Acts of the 80th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2007, is amended by adding Section 614.1241 to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 614.1241.  QUALIFIED RETIRED LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER.
 (a)  On request of a qualified retired law enforcement officer who
 holds a certificate of proficiency under Section 1701.357,
 Occupations Code, a law enforcement agency or other governmental
 entity in this state shall issue an identification card to the
 qualified retired law enforcement officer if the law enforcement
 agency or other governmental entity:
 (1)  was the last entity to appoint or employ the
 qualified retired law enforcement officer as a peace officer; or
 (2)  appointed or employed the qualified retired law
 enforcement officer for 20 years or more and the officer is
 receiving retirement or pension benefits as a result of that
 service.
 (b)  The identification card must include:
 (1)  the full name of the qualified retired law
 enforcement officer;
 (2)  a photograph of the qualified retired law
 enforcement officer consistent with the qualified retired law
 enforcement officer's appearance;
 (3)  the name of the law enforcement agency or other
 governmental entity that issued the card to the qualified retired
 law enforcement officer;
 (4)  if applicable, the signature of the person
 authorizing the issuance of the card on behalf of the law
 enforcement agency or other governmental entity to the qualified
 retired law enforcement officer;
 (5)  a brief description of the qualified retired law
 enforcement officer, including the qualified retired law
 enforcement officer's height, weight, and eye color;
 (6)  the thumbprint of the qualified retired law
 enforcement officer or a bar code with a unique identification
 label for the qualified retired law enforcement officer;
 (7)  the date the qualified retired law enforcement
 officer last served as a peace officer for the law enforcement
 agency or other governmental entity;
 (8)  the date the law enforcement agency or other
 governmental entity issued the card to the qualified retired law
 enforcement officer; and
 (9)  a phone number operational 24 hours a day, seven
 days a week, that a person may call to verify the validity of the
 identification card.
 (c)  On the identification card, the law enforcement agency
 or other governmental entity that issues the card shall print:
 (1)  "State of Texas" and the state seal; and
 (2)  "This identification card certifies that (insert
 name of qualified retired law enforcement officer) is a qualified
 retired law enforcement officer of (insert name of law enforcement
 agency or other governmental entity that last appointed or employed
 the qualified retired law enforcement officer)."
 (d)  The head of a law enforcement agency or other
 governmental entity that issued the identification card shall
 recover the identification card on the date the identification card
 expires.
 SECTION 3.  Section 614.127, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 614.127.  LOST OR STOLEN CARDS. If an identification
 card issued under this subchapter is lost or stolen, the law
 enforcement agency or other governmental entity that issued
 [issuing] the card to the peace officer, reserve law enforcement
 officer, honorably retired peace officer, or qualified retired law
 enforcement officer shall issue a duplicate identification card to
 the officer if the [may:
 [(1)     require a peace officer, reserve law enforcement
 officer, or honorably retired peace] officer submits [to submit] an
 affidavit executed by the [peace officer, reserve law enforcement
 officer, or honorably retired peace] officer to the law enforcement
 agency or other governmental entity [issuing the card] stating that
 the identification card was lost or stolen[; and
 [(2)     issue a duplicate identification card to the
 peace officer, reserve law enforcement officer, or honorably
 retired peace officer].
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *