Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3302 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Darby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3302
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 12, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3302 By:  Kolkhorst


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 HuffinesX
 EllisX
 FraserX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 HancockX
 KolkhorstX
 TaylorofCollinX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to highway landscaping projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 392, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 392.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 392.004.  REGIONALLY APPROPRIATE LANDSCAPING. The
 department shall establish guidelines for a beautification project
 on a state highway right-of-way that require the use of only
 regionally appropriate plants.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *