Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3310 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R23553 SGA-F
 By: Paul, Flynn, Bonnen of Brazoria H.B. No. 3310
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3310:
 By:  Stephenson C.S.H.B. No. 3310


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the funding policies, actuarial valuations, and
 reporting requirements of certain public retirement systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 801.209(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  For each public retirement system, the board shall post
 on the board's Internet website, or on a publicly available website
 that is linked to the board's website, the most recent data from
 reports received under Sections 802.101, 802.103, 802.104,
 802.105, [and] 802.108, and 802.2015.
 SECTION 2.  Section 802.101(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing body of a public retirement system shall
 employ an actuary, as a full-time or part-time employee or as a
 consultant, to make a valuation at least once every three years of
 the assets and liabilities of the system on the basis of assumptions
 and methods that are reasonable in the aggregate, considering the
 experience of the program and reasonable expectations, and that, in
 combination, offer the actuary's best estimate of anticipated
 experience under the program. The valuation must include a
 recommended contribution rate needed for the system to achieve and
 maintain an amortization period that does not exceed 30 years.
 SECTION 3.  Section 802.1014, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a public
 retirement system that has assets of at least $100 million shall
 conduct once every five years an actuarial experience study and
 shall submit to the board a copy of the actuarial experience study
 before the 31st day after the date of the study's adoption.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 802, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 802.2015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 802.2015.  FUNDING SOUNDNESS RESTORATION PLAN. (a)  In
 this section, "governmental entity" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 802.1012.
 (b)  A public retirement system shall notify the associated
 governmental entity in writing if the retirement system receives an
 actuarial valuation indicating that the system's actual
 contributions are not sufficient to amortize the unfunded actuarial
 accrued liability within 40 years.  If a public retirement system's
 actuarial valuation shows that the system's amortization period has
 exceeded 40 years for three consecutive annual actuarial
 valuations, or two consecutive actuarial valuations in the case of
 a system that conducts the valuations every two or three years, the
 governing body of the public retirement system and the associated
 governmental entity shall formulate a funding soundness
 restoration plan under Subsection (d) in accordance with the
 system's governing statute.
 (c)  The governing body of a public retirement system and the
 associated governmental entity that have formulated a funding
 soundness restoration plan under Subsection (d) shall formulate a
 revised funding soundness restoration plan under that subsection,
 in accordance with the system's governing statute, if the system
 conducts an actuarial valuation showing that:
 (1)  the system's amortization period exceeds 40 years;
 and
 (2)  the previously formulated funding soundness
 restoration plan has not been adhered to.
 (d)  A funding soundness restoration plan formulated under
 this section must:
 (1)  be developed by the public retirement system and
 the associated governmental entity in accordance with the system's
 governing statute; and
 (2)  be designed to achieve a contribution rate that
 will be sufficient to amortize the unfunded actuarial accrued
 liability within 40 years not later than the 10th anniversary of the
 date on which the final version of a funding soundness restoration
 plan is agreed to.
 (e)  A public retirement system and the associated
 governmental entity that formulate a funding soundness restoration
 plan shall report any updates of progress made by the entities
 toward improved actuarial soundness to the board every two years.
 (f)  Each public retirement system that formulates a funding
 soundness restoration plan as provided by this section shall submit
 a copy of that plan to the board and any change to the plan not later
 than the 31st day after the date on which the plan or the change is
 agreed to.
 SECTION 5.  A public retirement system subject to Section
 802.2015, Government Code, as added by this Act, shall formulate a
 funding soundness restoration plan, if required to do so under that
 section, based on the most recent actuarial valuation study
 conducted under Section 802.101, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, not later than November 1, 2016. The first actuarial
 valuation study that is conducted for or by a public retirement
 system on or after the effective date of this Act must include a
 recommended contribution rate.
 SECTION 6.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, a public retirement system subject to Section
 802.1014(b-1), Government Code, as added by this Act, shall conduct
 the first actuarial experience study required by Section
 802.1014(b-1), Government Code, as added by this Act, not later
 than September 1, 2016.
 (b)  A public retirement system subject to Section
 802.1014(b-1), Government Code, as added by this Act, that
 conducted an actuarial experience study after August 31, 2011, and
 on or before the effective date of this Act, shall conduct the first
 actuarial experience study required by Section 802.1014(b-1),
 Government Code, as added by this Act, not later than the fifth
 anniversary of the date of that preceding study.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.