Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3348 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Clardy, Schaefer (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 3348
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3348 By:  Menéndez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer
 baccalaureate degree programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.0012, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1), (b-2), (b-3), (k), and (l) to read as
 follows:
 (b-1)  The coordinating board shall establish a pilot
 project to examine the feasibility and effectiveness of authorizing
 baccalaureate degree programs in the field of dental hygiene at a
 public junior college that offers a degree program in that field,
 has a main campus located in the county seat of a county with a
 population greater than 200,000, and includes territory in at least
 six public school districts located in two counties. Subsection (g)
 does not apply to junior-level and senior-level courses offered
 under this subsection. In its recommendations to the legislature
 relating to state funding for public junior colleges, the
 coordinating board shall recommend that junior-level and
 senior-level courses offered under this subsection by a public
 junior college receive the same state support as other courses
 offered by the public junior college.
 (b-2)  Not later than January 1, 2017, the coordinating board
 shall prepare a progress report on the pilot project established
 under Subsection (b-1). Not later than January 1, 2019, the
 coordinating board shall prepare a report on the effectiveness of
 the pilot project, including any recommendations for legislative
 action regarding the offering of baccalaureate degree programs in
 the field of dental hygiene by a public junior college. The
 coordinating board shall deliver a copy of each report to the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the chair of the standing committee of each
 house of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over higher
 education. Unless the authority to continue offering a
 baccalaureate degree program in the field of dental hygiene is
 continued by the legislature, a public junior college may not:
 (1)  enroll a new student in a baccalaureate degree
 program under the pilot project after the 2019 fall semester;
 (2)  offer junior-level or senior-level courses for
 those degree programs after the 2021 fall semester, unless the
 coordinating board authorizes the college to offer those courses;
 or
 (3)  award a baccalaureate degree under the pilot
 project after the 2021 fall semester, unless the coordinating board
 approves the awarding of the degree.
 (b-3)  This subsection and Subsections (b-1) and (b-2)
 expire on the first June 15 following the first regular legislative
 session that occurs after the fourth anniversary of the date a
 public junior college offering a degree program in the field of
 dental hygiene under Subsection (b-1) meets the accreditation
 requirements of Subsection (c).
 (k)  The coordinating board shall adopt rules as necessary
 for the administration of this section.
 (l)  In this section, "general academic teaching
 institution" and "institution of higher education" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *