Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3357 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 3357
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to permitted methods for certain political subdivisions to
 post notice of a meeting.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 551.053(a) and (c), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing body of a water district or other district
 or political subdivision that extends into four or more counties
 shall:
 (1)  post notice of each meeting at a place convenient
 to the public in the administrative office of the district or
 political subdivision;
 (2)  provide notice of each meeting to the secretary of
 state; and
 (3)  either provide notice of each meeting to the
 county clerk of the county in which the administrative office of the
 district or political subdivision is located or post notice of each
 meeting on the district's or political subdivision's Internet
 website.
 (c)  A county clerk shall post a [the] notice provided to the
 clerk under Subsection (a)(3) on a bulletin board at a place
 convenient to the public in the county courthouse.
 SECTION 2.  Section 551.054, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 551.054.  DISTRICT OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION EXTENDING
 INTO FEWER THAN FOUR COUNTIES: NOTICE TO PUBLIC AND COUNTY CLERKS;
 PLACE OF POSTING NOTICE. (a) The governing body of a water
 district or other district or political subdivision that extends
 into fewer than four counties shall:
 (1)  post notice of each meeting at a place convenient
 to the public in the administrative office of the district or
 political subdivision; and
 (2)  either provide notice of each meeting to the
 county clerk of each county in which the district or political
 subdivision is located or post notice of each meeting on the
 district's or political subdivision's Internet website.
 (b)  A county clerk shall post a [the] notice provided to the
 clerk under Subsection (a)(2) on a bulletin board at a place
 convenient to the public in the county courthouse.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to notice for a meeting held on or after the effective date of this
 Act. Notice for a meeting held before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the law in effect on the date the notice is given, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *