Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3364 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schofield (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 3364
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appeal of a judgment in an eviction suit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.007, Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.007.  APPEAL. A final judgment of a county court in
 an eviction suit may not be appealed on the issue of possession
 unless the premises in question are being used for residential
 purposes only.  [(a)] A judgment of a county court [in an eviction
 suit] may not under any circumstances be stayed pending appeal
 unless, within 10 days of the signing of the judgment, the appellant
 files a supersedeas bond in an amount set by the county court.  In
 setting the supersedeas bond the county court shall provide
 protection for the appellee to the same extent as in any other
 appeal, taking into consideration the value of rents likely to
 accrue during appeal, damages which may occur as a result of the
 stay during appeal, and other damages or amounts as the court may
 deem appropriate.
 [(b)     Notwithstanding any other law, an appeal may be taken
 from a final judgment of a county court, statutory county court,
 statutory probate court, or district court in an eviction suit.]
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to an
 appeal of a final judgment rendered on or after the effective date
 of this Act. An appeal of a final judgment rendered before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the judgment was rendered, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016.
 * * * * *