Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3387 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Krause, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 3387
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3387 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to sex offender treatment as a condition of parole or
 mandatory supervision for certain releasees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 508, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 508.1862 to read as follows:
 Sec. 508.1862.  SEX OFFENDER TREATMENT. A parole panel
 shall require as a condition of release on parole or to mandatory
 supervision that a releasee participate in a sex offender treatment
 program developed by the department if:
 (1)  the releasee:
 (A)  was serving a sentence for an offense under
 Chapter 21, Penal Code; or
 (B)  is required to register as a sex offender
 under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal Procedure; and
 (2)  immediately before release, the releasee is
 participating in a sex offender treatment program established under
 Section 499.054.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter G, Chapter 508, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 508.228 to read as follows:
 Sec. 508.228.  SEX OFFENDER TREATMENT.  A parole panel may
 require as a condition of release on parole or to mandatory
 supervision that a releasee participate in a sex offender treatment
 program as specified by the parole panel if:
 (1)  the releasee:
 (A)  was serving a sentence for an offense under
 Chapter 21, Penal Code; or
 (B)  is required to register as a sex offender
 under Chapter 62, Code of Criminal Procedure; or
 (2)  a designated agent of the board after conducting a
 hearing that allows the releasee to contest the evidence, on
 evidence that a sex offense occurred during the commission of the
 offense for which the releasee was serving a sentence, makes an
 affirmative finding that, regardless of the offense for which the
 releasee was serving a sentence, the releasee constitutes a threat
 to society because of the releasee's lack of sexual control.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 508.1862 and 508.228, Government Code,
 as added by this Act, apply only to a decision of a parole panel made
 on or after the effective date of this Act. A decision of a parole
 panel made before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the decision was made, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *