H.B. No. 3404 AN ACT relating to a study on providing care to veterans with post-traumatic stress disorder. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission shall conduct a study on the benefits of providing integrated care to veterans with post-traumatic stress disorder. To conduct the study, the Health and Human Services Commission may coordinate with a university and medical school with expertise in behavioral health or post-traumatic stress disorder. The study must evaluate the benefits of: (1) using a standardized comprehensive trauma and post-traumatic stress disorder assessment to identify and target evidence-based treatment services to provide integrated care for veterans diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder; and (2) involving family members in the treatment of a veteran diagnosed with post-traumatic stress disorder. (b) Not later than December 1, 2016, the Health and Human Services Commission shall submit a report containing the results of the study conducted under Subsection (a) of this section to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives. The report must include the number of people served and the type of integrated care provided through the study. SECTION 2. This Act expires September 1, 2017. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3404 was passed by the House on May 12, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 8, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 3404 was passed by the Senate on May 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor