Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3424 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 3424


 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report on the establishment of a central
 database containing information about certain individuals under
 guardianship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "incapacitated person"
 means an adult who:
 (1)  because of a physical or mental condition, is
 substantially unable to:
 (A)  provide food, clothing, or shelter for
 himself or herself;
 (B)  care for the person's own physical health; or
 (C)  manage the person's own financial affairs;
 and
 (2)  has a guardian appointed under Title 3, Estates
 Code.
 (b)  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System shall conduct a study on:
 (1)  the feasibility of developing, implementing, and
 maintaining a computerized central database that contains:
 (A)  the names of incapacitated persons; and
 (B)  for each incapacitated person, the name of
 the guardian appointed for that person and contact information for
 the guardian; and
 (2)  best practices for protecting the privacy of
 incapacitated persons and the confidentiality of information
 included in the database.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2016, the director of the
 office of court administration shall provide a report on the
 results of the study to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, and the appropriate
 standing committees of the senate and the house of representatives.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3424 was passed by the House on May
 12, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 4, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3424 on May 29, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 2,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3424 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor