Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB345 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/19/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R2123 MK-D
 By: González H.B. No. 345


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a task force to study the standards of
 the Bilingual Target Language Proficiency Test administered to
 bilingual educators in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.0611 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.0611.  TASK FORCE ON BILINGUAL TARGET LANGUAGE
 PROFICIENCY TEST. (a) A task force is established under this
 section to examine and review the Bilingual Target Language
 Proficiency Test.
 (b)  The task force shall be composed of the following
 members appointed by the commissioner:
 (1)  one representative from the State Board for
 Educator Certification;
 (2)  one representative from the Bilingual/ESL Unit of
 the Division of Curriculum in the agency;
 (3)  four professional bilingual educators who are
 certified after taking the Bilingual Target Language Proficiency
 Test;
 (4)  four professional bilingual educators who are
 certified without taking the Bilingual Target Language Proficiency
 Test;
 (5)  two school district administrators who serve as
 coordinators of bilingual programs in urban school districts; and
 (6)  two school district administrators who serve as
 coordinators of bilingual programs in rural school districts.
 (c)  The member of the task force appointed under Subsection
 (b)(2) shall serve as the presiding officer of the task force.
 (d)  The commissioner shall appoint the members of the task
 force not later than November 1, 2015.
 (e)  The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of
 the task force on or before December 1, 2015. The task force shall
 meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines
 are appropriate. The task force shall adopt rules necessary to
 fulfill the task force's duties under this section.
 (f)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 (g)  The task force shall:
 (1)  review the Bilingual Target Language Proficiency
 Test and determine if the test effectively evaluates the skills a
 professional bilingual educator will use when interacting with
 students and parents of students;
 (2)  determine if the Bilingual Target Language
 Proficiency Test adequately identifies and delineates the
 essential knowledge and skills that a professional bilingual
 educator must teach students; and
 (3)  investigate the efficacy of the current passing
 standards for each domain of the Bilingual Target Language
 Proficiency Test in order to determine if the standards are overly
 restrictive.
 (h)  The task force shall prepare a report that includes:
 (1)  a description of the activities of the task force;
 (2)  the findings and recommendations of the task
 force, including any proposed policy and research recommendations;
 and
 (3)  any proposals for legislation or other matters the
 task force considers appropriate.
 (i)  Not later than September 1, 2016, the task force shall
 deliver the report required by Subsection (h) to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the commissioner.
 (j)  The task force is abolished and this section expires on
 December 1, 2016.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.