Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3451 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/12/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R6010 DDT-D
 By: Dale H.B. No. 3451


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of directors of certain electric
 cooperatives.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 161, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 161.0721 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.0721.  ELECTION OF DIRECTORS IN CERTAIN LARGE
 COOPERATIVES. (a)  This section applies only to an electric
 cooperative with more than 200,000 members that is partially
 located in a county with a population of more than one million and
 less than 1.5 million.
 (b)  Directors may be elected only by district. The board
 shall establish single-member districts from which the directors
 are to be elected. In establishing the districts, the board shall
 ensure that directors represent geographic areas in which
 approximately equal numbers of members reside.
 (c)  A member may vote for a director to represent a district
 only if the member resides in that district.
 (d)  To be elected, a candidate must receive a majority of
 the total number of votes received in the candidate's district.
 (e)  If no candidate for a particular district receives the
 vote necessary to be elected, a runoff election for that office is
 required.
 (f)  A director serves a four-year term.
 (g)  The first board of directors elected from the districts
 established under Subsection (b) may agree to establish a system of
 staggered terms by providing that approximately half of that first
 board of directors will serve initial terms of two years.
 (h)  Elections must be held in November of an odd-numbered
 year.
 SECTION 2.  (a) An electric cooperative to which Section
 161.0721, Utilities Code, as added by this Act, applies shall
 establish single-member districts as required by that section as
 soon as practicable, and not later than October 1, 2015.
 (b)  The electric cooperative shall hold an election as
 required by this Act on or before November 30, 2015. At that
 election, all board member positions will be up for election. The
 terms of all directors serving on the date of the election are
 terminated, and the terms of the newly elected directors begin, on
 January 31, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.