Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3494 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/12/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R7999 KKA-D
 By: Huberty H.B. No. 3494


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to educator preparation programs and teacher
 certification examinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.0441, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  The overall grade point average of each incoming class
 admitted by an educator preparation program, including an
 alternative educator preparation program, may not be less than 3.00
 on a four-point scale or the equivalent or a higher overall grade
 point average prescribed by the board. In computing the overall
 grade point average of an incoming class for purposes of this
 subsection, a program may:
 (1)  include the grade point average of each person in
 the incoming class based on all course work previously attempted by
 the person at a public or private institution of higher education;
 or
 (2)  include the grade point average of each person in
 the incoming class based only on the last 60 semester credit hours
 attempted by the person at a public or private institution of higher
 education.
 (d)  A person seeking career and technology education
 certification is not included in determining the overall grade
 point average of an incoming class under Subsection (c).
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.045(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Each educator preparation program shall submit data
 elements as required by the board for an annual performance report
 to ensure access and equity.  At a minimum, the annual report must
 contain:
 (1)  the performance data from Subsection (a), other
 than the data required for purposes of Subsection (a)(3), and the
 following information, disaggregated by sex and ethnicity:
 (A) [(1)]  the number of candidates who apply;
 (B) [(2)]  the number of candidates admitted;
 (C) [(3)]  the number of candidates retained;
 (D) [(4)]  the number of candidates completing
 the program;
 (E) [(5)]  the number of candidates employed as
 beginning teachers [in the profession] after completing the
 program;
 (F)  the amount of time required by candidates
 employed as beginning teachers to progress from a probationary
 teaching certificate to a standard teaching certificate;
 (G) [(6)]  the number of candidates retained in
 the profession; and
 (H) [(7)]  any other information required by
 federal law;
 (2)  the ratio of candidates employed as beginning
 teachers to field supervisors; and
 (3)  any other information necessary to enable the
 board to assess the effectiveness of the program on the basis of
 teacher retention and success criteria adopted by the board.
 SECTION 3.  Section 21.048, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a-1) and (c-1) and adding Subsection (a-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a-1)  The board may not require that more than 45 days
 elapse before a person may retake an examination. A person may not
 retake an examination more than four times, unless the board waives
 the limitation for good cause as prescribed by the board.
 (a-2)  For purposes of the limitation imposed by Subsection
 (a-1) on the number of administrations of an examination, a person
 who initially took an examination before September 1, 2015, may
 retake the examination up to four times after that date, regardless
 of the number of times that the person attempted to perform
 satisfactorily on the examination before that date. This
 subsection expires September 1, 2018.
 (c-1)  The results of an examination administered under this
 section are confidential and are not subject to disclosure under
 Chapter 552, Government Code, unless[:
 [(1)]  the disclosure is regarding notification to a
 parent of the assignment of an uncertified teacher to a classroom as
 required by Section 21.057[; or
 [(2)     the educator has failed the examination more than
 five times].
 SECTION 4.  Effective September 1, 2016, Section 21.051,
 Education Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding
 Subsections (b-1) and (c-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  Before a school district may employ a candidate for
 certification as a teacher of record, the candidate must complete
 at least 30 [15] hours of field-based experience in which the
 candidate is actively engaged in instructional or educational
 activities in the classroom under supervision at:
 (1)  a public school campus accredited or approved for
 the purpose by the agency; or
 (2)  a private school recognized or approved for the
 purpose by the agency.
 (b-1)  The hours of field-based experience required by
 Subsection (b) may not be provided through use of electronic
 transmission or other video- or technology-based method.
 (c-1)  Subsections (b) and (b-1), as amended and added by
 __.B. ____, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015,
 apply only to an initial certification issued on or after September
 1, 2016. Those provisions do not affect:
 (1)  the validity of a certification issued before
 September 1, 2016; or
 (2)  the eligibility of a person who holds a
 certification issued before September 1, 2016, to obtain a
 subsequent renewal of the certification in accordance with board
 rule.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the State Board
 for Educator Certification shall develop criteria for evaluation of
 educator preparation programs based on teacher retention and
 success as required by Section 21.045(b)(3), Education Code, as
 added by this Act. The State Board for Educator Certification shall
 consult with the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board in
 developing the criteria, and the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board shall participate and provide recommendations
 regarding the criteria.
 SECTION 6.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.