Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3577 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Howard, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 3577
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3577 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the allocation of funds to eligible institutions under
 the Texas Educational Opportunity Grant Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.403, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  The coordinating board shall consult with
 representatives of eligible institutions to determine the
 percentage of the total amount available for initial grants under
 the program to be allocated to each type of eligible institution for
 the distribution of initial grants under the program. If the
 representatives cannot reach a unanimous consensus on the
 percentage for each allocation, the coordinating board shall
 allocate 92 percent of the total amount available for initial
 grants under the program to public junior colleges and allocate the
 remaining amount to other eligible institutions.  This subsection
 expires August 31, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 allocations to eligible institutions under Subchapter P, Chapter
 56, Education Code, as amended by this Act, beginning with the
 2015-2016 academic year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *