Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3595 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2015

                    By: Morrison (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 3595
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 22, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 22, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 351.101, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  In addition to the uses authorized by Subsection (a), a
 municipality described by Subsection (a)(7)(B)(viii), as added by
 Chapter 546 (S.B. 585), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2013, may use revenue derived from the tax authorized by
 this chapter to promote tourism and the convention and hotel
 industry by constructing, maintaining, or expanding a
 sporting-related facility owned by the municipality if:
 (1)  the majority of the events at the facility involve
 participants staying at hotels in the municipality; and
 (2)  for a fiscal year, the municipality does not
 reduce the amount of that revenue that it uses for a purpose
 described by Subsection (a)(3) to an amount that is less than the
 lesser of:
 (A)  the amount of that revenue used by the
 municipality for that purpose during the municipality's 2015 fiscal
 year; or
 (B)  the total amount of that revenue received in
 the fiscal year.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *