Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3658 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R22062 LED-D
 By: King of Taylor H.B. No. 3658


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development and administration of a parent
 orientation and education pilot program for recipients of
 subsidized child-care services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 4, Labor Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 316 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 316. PARENT ORIENTATION AND EDUCATION PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 316.001.  PARENT ORIENTATION AND EDUCATION PILOT
 PROGRAM. (a) The commission shall develop and implement a pilot
 program to offer parent orientation and other parent education
 programs to parents receiving subsidized child-care services
 through a local workforce development board.
 (b)  The commission shall select one local workforce
 development board located in a rural area and one local workforce
 development board located in an urban area to participate in the
 pilot program.
 (c)  Not later than December 1, 2016, a participating local
 workforce development board shall competitively procure a
 curriculum for a parent orientation program to be offered by the
 local workforce development board to parents initially receiving or
 waiting to receive subsidized child-care services. Not later than
 December 1, 2016, the participating local workforce development
 board shall also competitively procure curricula for additional
 parent education programs for parents receiving subsidized
 child-care services to supplement parent orientation. To the extent
 practicable, a local workforce development board must procure
 commercially available parent education program curricula.
 (d)  A participating local workforce development board shall
 ensure that the curriculum for each program includes information
 for parents relating to:
 (1)  early brain development;
 (2)  child growth and development;
 (3)  the importance of continuity of child care; and
 (4)  strategies for:
 (A)  employing positive child guidance;
 (B)  selecting a quality child-care program; and
 (C)  supporting a child's educational success.
 Sec. 316.002.  PARENT PARTICIPATION IN PARENT ORIENTATION.
 (a)  A participating local workforce development board shall offer
 parent orientation to a parent who is eligible to receive
 subsidized child-care services through the board.  A board may not
 require a parent to participate in the orientation.
 (b)  A participating local workforce development board shall
 ensure that a parent who participates in the parent orientation
 receives priority for child-care services within the parent's
 priority group, as established by the commission, over those
 parents within the priority group who do not participate in the
 orientation.
 (c)  Each participating local workforce development board
 shall establish a deadline by which a parent who applies for
 subsidized child-care services must complete the parent
 orientation in order to receive the benefit of participation
 described in Subsection (b).
 Sec. 316.003.  PARENT ORIENTATION REQUIREMENTS. (a)  A
 participating local workforce development board shall use the
 parent orientation program curriculum procured by that board under
 Section 316.001 as the content of parent orientation.
 (b)  A participating local workforce development board shall
 offer parent orientation at least three times a month.
 (c)  A participating local workforce development board
 shall:
 (1)  select, in a manner consistent with contracting
 guidelines established under Section 2308.264, Government Code, an
 instructor for the parent orientation through a competitive
 procurement process; or
 (2)  select a contractor who is already providing
 workforce training or services to act as the instructor for parent
 orientation.
 (d)  A parent orientation session must:
 (1)  include both group discussion and video
 programming; and
 (2)  be at least 1-1/2 hours but not more than 3 hours
 in duration.
 (e)  A participating local workforce development board shall
 provide parent orientation in English and in a second language
 appropriate to the demographic makeup of the community served.
 (f)  A participating local workforce development board may
 conduct parent orientation at a physical location where the board
 provides services or at a location in the community that is
 accessible to participants in the orientation. The board shall
 provide the option to participate in parent orientation by video
 conference through the Internet.
 Sec. 316.004.  ADDITIONAL PARENT EDUCATION PROGRAMS. (a)
 In addition to parent orientation, a participating local workforce
 development board shall offer parent education programs using the
 parent education program curricula procured by that board under
 Section 316.001 to a parent receiving subsidized child-care
 services through the board. A board may not require a parent to
 participate in a parent education program.
 (b)  A participating local workforce development board may
 offer incentives to encourage participation in the parent education
 programs.
 (c)  A participating local workforce development board shall
 offer the parent education programs in the languages, locations,
 and manner described by Sections 316.003(e) and (f).
 Sec. 316.005.  PARENT EDUCATION PROGRAM IN LIEU OF
 TERMINATION. (a)  Subject to Subsection (b), a parent receiving
 subsidized child-care services through a participating local
 workforce development board who becomes ineligible for subsidized
 child-care services because of a child's excessive absences may
 retain eligibility for child-care services if the parent:
 (1)  enrolls in a parent education program offered by a
 local workforce development board under Section 316.004 not later
 than the 30th day after the date the board sends notice of
 ineligibility to the parent; and
 (2)  successfully completes the parent education
 program within the time designated by board policy.
 (b)  A parent may retain eligibility for child-care services
 by completing a parent education program as provided by this
 section after only the first time the parent becomes ineligible for
 a reason under Subsection (a).
 (c)  A participating local workforce development board shall
 adopt policies to administer this section, including a policy that:
 (1)  specifies the manner in which a parent proves
 successful completion of a parent education program under this
 section; and
 (2)  ensures that a parent described under Subsection
 (a) will continue to receive child-care services while the parent
 is completing the parent education program.
 Sec. 316.006.  EVALUATION AND REPORT TO LEGISLATURE. (a)
 The commission shall develop a process for evaluating the
 effectiveness of the parent orientation and education programs and
 determine performance measures for the evaluation process not later
 than January 1, 2018.
 (b)  The evaluation process under this section must:
 (1)  provide for the collection of feedback from
 parents who participated in the parent orientation and education
 programs; and
 (2)  determine whether the parent orientation and
 education programs should be continued, modified, or expanded for
 statewide implementation.
 (c)  The commission shall issue a report to the legislature
 regarding the commission's findings under this section and
 recommendations regarding the parent orientation and education
 programs.
 Sec. 316.007.  EXPIRATION.  This chapter expires January 15,
 2019.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Workforce Commission is required to
 perform the evaluation and issue the report as required under
 Section 316.006, Labor Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 January 15, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that authorization from a federal agency
 is necessary for implementation of that provision, the agency
 affected by the provision shall request the authorization and may
 delay implementing that provision until the authorization is
 granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.