Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3730 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/17/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Leach H.B. No. 3730


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a committee to study adoption practices
 in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 162, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 162.603 to read as follows:
 Sec. 162.603.  ADOPTION PRACTICES COMMITTEE.  (a)  The
 adoption practices committee is created to study and make
 recommendations for improving adoption practices in this state.
 (b)  The committee consists of nine members appointed by the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission,
 in consultation with the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the
 house of representatives, as follows:
 (1)  a member of the house of representatives;
 (2)  a member of the senate;
 (3)  a manager of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services with experience in adoption related issues;
 (4)  a representative of a family violence advocacy
 center;
 (5)  a member who
 is an adoption lawyer;
 (6)  an Administrator from a licensed child placing
 agency with experience in both state contract and private adoption;
 (7)  a member who is a psychiatrist; and
 (8)  three members who are adoptive parents.
 (c)  Not later than June 1, 2018, the adoption practices
 committee shall prepare and submit to the office of the governor and
 the legislature a written report regarding the committee's
 findings and recommendations.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 appoint the members of the adoption practices committee under
 Section 162.603, Family Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.