Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3923 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 4, 2015      TO: Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3923 by Wray (Relating to ready-mix concrete trucks.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3923, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.Additionally, the bill will have a direct impact of a revenue loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund of ($2,628,000) for the 2016-17 biennium.  Any loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund must be made up with an equal amount of General Revenue to fund the Foundation School Program. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 4, 2015





  TO: Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB3923 by Wray (Relating to ready-mix concrete trucks.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB3923 by Wray (Relating to ready-mix concrete trucks.), As Introduced

 Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means 

 Honorable Dennis Bonnen, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB3923 by Wray (Relating to ready-mix concrete trucks.), As Introduced

HB3923 by Wray (Relating to ready-mix concrete trucks.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3923, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.Additionally, the bill will have a direct impact of a revenue loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund of ($2,628,000) for the 2016-17 biennium.  Any loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund must be made up with an equal amount of General Revenue to fund the Foundation School Program. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB3923, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.Additionally, the bill will have a direct impact of a revenue loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund of ($2,628,000) for the 2016-17 biennium.  Any loss to the Property Tax Relief Fund must be made up with an equal amount of General Revenue to fund the Foundation School Program.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 $0   2017 $0   2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 $0    


2016 $0
2017 $0
2018 $0
2019 $0
2020 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromProperty Tax Relief Fund304    2016 ($1,301,000)   2017 ($1,327,000)   2018 ($1,353,000)   2019 ($1,380,000)   2020 ($1,408,000)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromProperty Tax Relief Fund304    2016 ($1,301,000)   2017 ($1,327,000)   2018 ($1,353,000)   2019 ($1,380,000)   2020 ($1,408,000)  


2016 ($1,301,000)
2017 ($1,327,000)
2018 ($1,353,000)
2019 ($1,380,000)
2020 ($1,408,000)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Chapter 171 of the Tax Code, regarding the franchise tax, by adding to the activities included under "production" for the cost of goods sold subtraction in determining franchise tax liability. The added activity is the manufacture of a good while in transit and affects ready-mix concrete trucks.  The bill would amend the list of costs included in cost of goods sold to include production costs allocable to the manufacture of a good while in transit. The bill would amend Subsection 622.011(a) of the Transportation Code regarding the definition of "ready-mix concrete truck" to substitute "while manufacturing" for "and manufacture," and to add "a volumetric ready-mix concrete truck" to the definition.  The bill's franchise tax provisions would only apply to a report originally due on or after January 1, 2016. The bill would take effect September 1, 2015.

Methodology

The estimated fiscal impact is based on information from the Texas Aggregates & Concrete Association and on the Comptroller's franchise tax data bases.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: UP, KK, SD

 UP, KK, SD