Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB401 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/26/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R2498 TJB/JAM-F
 By: Harless H.B. No. 401


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain fees deposited to the credit of the state
 highway fund; increasing motor vehicle registration fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 222, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 222.0015 to read as follows:
 Sec. 222.0015.  USE OF CERTAIN MONEY IN STATE HIGHWAY FUND.
 (a) This section applies only to money deposited to the credit of
 the state highway fund from the collection of registration fees
 under Sections 502.251, 502.252, 502.253, and 502.254 attributable
 to the portion of the applicable rates of those fees that exceed the
 rates in effect on August 31, 2015.
 (b)  Notwithstanding other law, including Sections 201.115,
 222.001, and 222.003, money described by Subsection (a):
 (1)  may not be pledged for the repayment of bonds; and
 (2)  may be used only for acquiring rights-of-way and
 planning, designing, constructing, and maintaining nontolled
 public roadways.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Section 502.251, Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.251.  FEE:  MOTORCYCLE OR MOPED.  The fee for a
 registration year for registration of a motorcycle or moped is $45
 [$30].
 (b)  Effective January 1, 2018, Section 502.251,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.251.  FEE:  MOTORCYCLE OR MOPED.  The fee for a
 registration year for registration of a motorcycle or moped is $60
 [$30].
 SECTION 3.  (a) Section 502.252(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The fee for a registration year for registration of a
 vehicle with a gross weight of 6,000 pounds or less is $75 [$50.75],
 unless otherwise provided in this chapter.
 (b)  Effective January 1, 2018, Section 502.252(a),
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The fee for a registration year for registration of a
 vehicle with a gross weight of 6,000 pounds or less is $100
 [$50.75], unless otherwise provided in this chapter.
 SECTION 4.  Effective January 1, 2017, Section 502.253,
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.253.  FEE: VEHICLES THAT WEIGH MORE THAN 6,000
 POUNDS.   The fee for a registration year for registration of a
 vehicle with a gross weight of more than 6,000 pounds is as follows
 unless otherwise provided in this chapter:
 Weight Classification Fee Schedule Weight Classification Fee Schedule
Weight Classification Fee Schedule
 in pounds in pounds
in pounds
 6,001-10,000 $110 [$54.00] 6,001-10,000 $110 [$54.00]
6,001-10,000 $110 [$54.00]
 10,001-18,000  $220 [$110.00] 10,001-18,000 $220 [$110.00]
10,001-18,000 $220 [$110.00]
 18,001-25,999  $410 [$205.00] 18,001-25,999 $410 [$205.00]
18,001-25,999 $410 [$205.00]
 26,000-40,000  $680 [$340.00] 26,000-40,000 $680 [$340.00]
26,000-40,000 $680 [$340.00]
 40,001-54,999    $1,070 [$535.00] 40,001-54,999 $1,070 [$535.00]
40,001-54,999 $1,070 [$535.00]
 55,000-70,000    $1,480 [$740.00] 55,000-70,000 $1,480 [$740.00]
55,000-70,000 $1,480 [$740.00]
 70,001-80,000    $1,680 [$840.00] 70,001-80,000 $1,680 [$840.00]
70,001-80,000 $1,680 [$840.00]
 SECTION 5.  Effective January 1, 2017, Section 502.254(a),
 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The fee for a registration year for registration of a
 trailer, travel trailer, or semitrailer with a gross weight of
 6,000 pounds or less is $90 [$45.00].
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, limiting the permissible uses of the state
 highway fund, including further limiting the use of additional tax
 and fee revenue attributable to changes to certain state taxes and
 fees, to increase revenue for nontolled public highway purposes is
 approved by the voters. If that amendment is not approved by the
 voters, this Act has no effect.

Weight Classification Fee Schedule

in pounds

6,001-10,000 $110 [$54.00]

10,001-18,000 $220 [$110.00]

18,001-25,999 $410 [$205.00]

26,000-40,000 $680 [$340.00]

40,001-54,999 $1,070 [$535.00]

55,000-70,000 $1,480 [$740.00]

70,001-80,000 $1,680 [$840.00]