Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4097 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hunter, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 4097
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 20, 2015, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4097 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to seawater desalination projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.203, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  The commission, in cooperation with transmission and
 distribution utilities and the ERCOT independent system operator,
 shall study whether existing transmission and distribution
 planning processes are sufficient to provide adequate
 infrastructure for seawater desalination projects. If the
 commission determines that statutory changes are needed to ensure
 that adequate infrastructure is developed for projects of that
 kind, the commission shall include recommendations in the report
 required by Section 31.003.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.9055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.9055.  EXAMINATION OF DEMAND RESPONSE POTENTIAL OF
 SEAWATER DESALINATION PROJECTS. The commission and the ERCOT
 independent system operator shall study the potential for seawater
 desalination projects to participate in existing demand response
 opportunities in the ERCOT market. To the extent feasible, the
 study shall determine whether the operational characteristics of
 seawater desalination projects enable projects of that kind to
 participate in ERCOT-operated ancillary services markets or other
 competitively supplied demand response opportunities. The study
 shall also determine the potential economic benefit to a seawater
 desalination project if the project is able to reduce its demand
 during peak pricing periods. The commission shall include the
 results of the study in the report required by Section 31.003.
 SECTION 3.  Section 11.121, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 11.121.  PERMIT REQUIRED. Except as provided in
 Sections 11.1405, 11.142, 11.1421, and 11.1422 [of this code], no
 person may appropriate any state water or begin construction of any
 work designed for the storage, taking, or diversion of water
 without first obtaining a permit from the commission to make the
 appropriation.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter D, Chapter 11, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 11.1405 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.1405.  DESALINATION OF SEAWATER FOR USE FOR
 INDUSTRIAL PURPOSES. (a)  The commission may issue a permit under
 this section to authorize a diversion of state water from the Gulf
 of Mexico or a bay or arm of the Gulf of Mexico for desalination and
 use for industrial purposes if:
 (1)  the point of diversion is located less than three
 miles seaward of any point located on the coast of this state; or
 (2)  the seawater contains a total dissolved solids
 concentration based on a yearly average of samples taken monthly at
 the water source of less than 20,000 milligrams per liter.
 (b)  A person may divert state water from the Gulf of Mexico
 or a bay or arm of the Gulf of Mexico for desalination and use for
 industrial purposes without obtaining a permit if Subsection (a)
 does not apply.
 (c)  A person who diverts and uses state water that consists
 of marine seawater under a permit issued under Subsection (a) or as
 authorized by Subsection (b) must determine the total dissolved
 solids concentration of the seawater at the water source by monthly
 sampling and analysis and provide the data collected to the
 commission. A person may not begin construction of a facility for
 the diversion of marine seawater for the purposes provided by this
 section without obtaining a permit until the person has provided
 data to the commission based on the analysis of samples taken at the
 water source over a period of at least one year demonstrating that
 Subsection (a)(2) does not apply. A person who has begun
 construction of a facility for the diversion of marine seawater for
 the purposes provided by this section without obtaining a permit
 because the person has demonstrated that Subsection (a)(2) does not
 apply is not required to obtain a permit for the facility if the
 total dissolved solids concentration of the seawater at the water
 source subsequently changes so that Subsection (a)(2) applies.
 (d)  A permit application under this section must be
 submitted as required by commission rule.
 (e)  The commission is not required to make a finding of
 water availability for an application under this section.
 (f)  The commission shall evaluate whether any proposed
 diversion under this section is consistent with any applicable
 environmental flow standards established under Section 11.1471.
 (g)  The commission may include any provision in a permit
 issued under this section that the commission considers necessary
 to comply with the environmental flow standards established under
 Section 11.1471.
 (h)  The commission shall adopt rules providing an expedited
 procedure for acting on an application for a permit under
 Subsection (a). The rules must provide for notice, an opportunity
 for the submission of written comment, and an opportunity for a
 contested case hearing regarding commission actions relating to an
 application for a permit.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter B, Chapter 26, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 26.0272 to read as follows:
 Sec. 26.0272.  PERMITS AUTHORIZING DISCHARGES FROM CERTAIN
 SEAWATER DESALINATION FACILITIES. (a) This section applies only to
 a facility that generates water treatment residuals from the
 desalination of seawater solely for use as part of an industrial
 process.
 (b)  The commission may issue a permit for the discharge of
 water treatment residuals from the desalination of seawater into
 the portion of the Gulf of Mexico inside the territorial limits of
 the state.
 (c)  Before issuing a permit under this section, the
 commission must evaluate the discharge of water treatment residuals
 from the desalination of seawater into the Gulf of Mexico for
 compliance with the state water quality standards adopted by the
 commission, the requirements of the Texas Pollutant Discharge
 Elimination System program, and applicable federal law.
 (d)  The commission may issue individual permits or a general
 permit under this section. If the commission elects to issue
 individual permits under this section, the commission must
 establish procedures for the review of an application that, at a
 minimum, comply with the requirements of Subchapter M, Chapter 5.
 If the commission elects to issue a general permit under this
 section, the commission must comply with the requirements of
 Section 26.040.
 SECTION 6.  Section 27.021, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A permit issued under this section may authorize the
 disposal of water treatment residuals produced by the desalination
 of seawater.
 SECTION 7.  Section 27.025, Water Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A general permit issued under this section may
 authorize an injection well for the disposal of concentrate
 produced by the desalination of seawater. The general permit must
 include any requirements necessary to maintain delegation of the
 federal underground injection control program administered by the
 commission.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *