Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4115 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 8, 2015      TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB4115 by Pickett (Relating to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles fund.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4115, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($250,722,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.There would be a similar gain to Other Funds, in the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles Fund. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 8, 2015





  TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB4115 by Pickett (Relating to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles fund.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB4115 by Pickett (Relating to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles fund.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Honorable Joseph Pickett, Chair, House Committee on Transportation 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB4115 by Pickett (Relating to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles fund.), As Introduced

HB4115 by Pickett (Relating to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles fund.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4115, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($250,722,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.There would be a similar gain to Other Funds, in the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles Fund. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4115, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($250,722,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017.There would be a similar gain to Other Funds, in the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles Fund.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 ($123,910,000)   2017 ($126,812,000)   2018 ($129,348,000)   2019 ($131,935,000)   2020 ($134,574,000)    


2016 ($123,910,000)
2017 ($126,812,000)
2018 ($129,348,000)
2019 ($131,935,000)
2020 ($134,574,000)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromTexas Department of Motor Vehicles Fund   2016 ($123,910,000) ($84,418,000) $208,328,000   2017 ($126,812,000) $0 $126,812,000   2018 ($129,348,000) $0 $129,348,000   2019 ($131,935,000) $0 $131,935,000   2020 ($134,574,000) $0 $134,574,000   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromState Highway Fund6  Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromTexas Department of Motor Vehicles Fund   2016 ($123,910,000) ($84,418,000) $208,328,000   2017 ($126,812,000) $0 $126,812,000   2018 ($129,348,000) $0 $129,348,000   2019 ($131,935,000) $0 $131,935,000   2020 ($134,574,000) $0 $134,574,000  


2016 ($123,910,000) ($84,418,000) $208,328,000
2017 ($126,812,000) $0 $126,812,000
2018 ($129,348,000) $0 $129,348,000
2019 ($131,935,000) $0 $131,935,000
2020 ($134,574,000) $0 $134,574,000

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would re-enact the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles (TxDMV) Fund created by Section 1001.151, Transportation Code, and all revenue dedicated for deposit to the credit of that fund as enacted by Section 71, Chapter 1287 (HB 2202), Acts of the Eighty-third Legislature, Regular Session, 2013. The fund would be established as a special fund in the state treasury outside the General Revenue Fund. The bill would direct the Comptroller, on September 1, 2015, to deposit to the credit of the TxDMV Fund an amount from the State Highway Fund (SHF) equal to the amount collected or received by DMV under Section 502.356, Transportation Code, relating to the automated registration and title system, during the period beginning November 1, 2009, and ending September 1, 2013. The bill would take effect on September 1, 2015.

Methodology

Based on the information provided by the DMV and the Comptroller's office, it is assumed the re-enactment of the TxDMV Fund and all revenue dedicated for deposit to the fund under the provisions of HB 2202, Eighty-third Legislature, 2013, would result in a revenue loss to General Revenue and a corresponding gain to the TxDMV Fund of $123.9 million beginning in fiscal year 2016, which would increase by approximately two percent each year thereafter. The DMV reports that $84.4 million in revenue was collected from the $1 automation fee under Section 502.356, Transportation Code, during the period beginning November 1, 2009, and ending September 1, 2013. Therefore, it is assumed the Comptroller would make a one-time transfer of $84.4 million out of the SHF to the TxDMV Fund in fiscal year 2016.Note: This legislation would do one or more of the following: create or recreate a dedicated account in the General Revenue Fund, create or recreate a special or trust fund either with or outside of the Treasury, or create a dedicated revenue source. The fund, account, or revenue dedication included in this bill would be subject to funds consolidation review by the current Legislature.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 601 Department of Transportation, 608 Department of Motor Vehicles

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 601 Department of Transportation, 608 Department of Motor Vehicles

LBB Staff: UP, AG, NV, TG, KK

 UP, AG, NV, TG, KK