Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4115 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Pickett H.B. No. 4115


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 rel
 ating to the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  On September 1, 2015, the Texas Department of
 Motor Vehicles fund created by Section 1001.151, Transportation
 Code, as enacted by Section 71, Chapter 1287 (H.B. 2202), Acts of
 the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, is re-created by this
 Act as a special fund in the state treasury outside the general
 revenue fund, and all revenue dedicated for deposit to the credit of
 the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles fund by a provision of
 Chapter 1287 (H.B. 2202), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2013, is rededicated by this Act for that purpose.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  On September 1, 2015, the comptroller shall
 transfer to the credit of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles
 fund, as re-created by this Act, an amount from the state highway
 fund equal to the total amount of fees collected or received by the
 Texas Department of Motor Vehicles under Section 502.356,
 Transportation Code, and former Section 502.1705, Transportation
 Code, during the period beginning November 1, 2009, and ending
 August 31, 2013.
 (b)  To the extent that money from the state highway fund
 transferred to the credit of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles
 fund as required by Subsection (a) of this section was, before
 September 1, 2013, used as collateral or as a source of payment for
 the repayment of a loan, bond, credit agreement, public security,
 or other obligation, that amount remains subject to use as
 collateral or as a source of payment for the obligation.  However,
 an obligation described by this subsection must be paid first from
 the state highway fund, and the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles
 fund is subject to payment of the obligation only to the extent the
 state highway fund is depleted at the time the obligation matures
 and becomes due.
 SECTION 3.  Except as specified by Section 2 of this Act, of
 the revenue dedicated for deposit to the credit of the Texas
 Department of Motor Vehicles fund by a provision of Chapter 1287
 (H.B. 2202), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013,
 the comptroller shall deposit to the credit of that fund only
 revenue received on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.