Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4131 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wu (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 4131
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 MenéndezX
 NicholsX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to competitive bidding procedures and election
 requirements for the Westchase District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 3802.159(a) and (c), Special District
 Local Laws Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to the elections required under Subchapter
 L, Chapter 375, Local Government Code, the district must hold an
 election in the manner provided by that subchapter to obtain voter
 approval before the district may:
 (1)  impose a maintenance tax; or
 (2)  issue a bond payable from ad valorem taxes [or
 assessments].
 (c)  The board may not call a bond [an] election under this
 chapter unless a written petition requesting the [an] election has
 been filed with the board. The petition must be signed by:
 (1)  the owners of a majority of the assessed value of
 real property in the district according to the most recent
 certified tax appraisal roll for Harris County; or
 (2)  at least 50 persons who own property in the
 district, if there are more than 50 persons who own property in the
 district according to the most recent certified tax appraisal roll
 for Harris County.
 SECTION 2.  Section 3802.104, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *