Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB431 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 21, 2015      TO: Honorable Harold V. Dutton, Jr., Chair, House Committee on Juvenile Justice & Family Issues      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine the retention of juvenile justice records.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the Juvenile Justice Board to appoint a committee to examine best practices regarding the retention of juvenile justice records and propose amendments to relevant law concerning juvenile justice records. The bill requires that the committee submit a report of recommendations to the Juvenile Justice Board no later than December 1, 2016. The committee would be abolished January 1, 2017. This analysis assumes that the Juvenile Justice Department and the Department of Family and Protective Services could implement the provisions of the bill by utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each chamber, otherwise it would take effect September 1, 2015. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 644 Juvenile Justice Department   LBB Staff:  UP, ESi, AI, RCa    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 21, 2015





  TO: Honorable Harold V. Dutton, Jr., Chair, House Committee on Juvenile Justice & Family Issues      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine the retention of juvenile justice records.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Harold V. Dutton, Jr., Chair, House Committee on Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine the retention of juvenile justice records.), As Introduced

 Honorable Harold V. Dutton, Jr., Chair, House Committee on Juvenile Justice & Family Issues 

 Honorable Harold V. Dutton, Jr., Chair, House Committee on Juvenile Justice & Family Issues 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine the retention of juvenile justice records.), As Introduced

HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine the retention of juvenile justice records.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the Juvenile Justice Board to appoint a committee to examine best practices regarding the retention of juvenile justice records and propose amendments to relevant law concerning juvenile justice records. The bill requires that the committee submit a report of recommendations to the Juvenile Justice Board no later than December 1, 2016. The committee would be abolished January 1, 2017. This analysis assumes that the Juvenile Justice Department and the Department of Family and Protective Services could implement the provisions of the bill by utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each chamber, otherwise it would take effect September 1, 2015.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 644 Juvenile Justice Department

530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 644 Juvenile Justice Department

LBB Staff: UP, ESi, AI, RCa

 UP, ESi, AI, RCa