Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB431 Engrossed / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 28, 2015      TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine and recommend revisions to any state laws pertaining to juvenile records.), As Engrossed    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would require the Juvenile Justice Board to appoint a committee to develop a plan for studying, reorganizing, and revising relevant laws concerning juvenile justice records. The bill requires that the committee submit a report of recommendations to the legislature and the Juvenile Justice Board no later than November 1, 2016. The committee would be abolished December 31, 2018. This analysis assumes that the Juvenile Justice Department and the Department of Family and Protective Services could implement the provisions of the bill by utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each chamber, otherwise it would take effect September 1, 2015. Local Government Impact No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 644 Juvenile Justice Department   LBB Staff:  UP, AG, ESi, AI, RCa    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 28, 2015





  TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine and recommend revisions to any state laws pertaining to juvenile records.), As Engrossed  

TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine and recommend revisions to any state laws pertaining to juvenile records.), As Engrossed

 Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs 

 Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine and recommend revisions to any state laws pertaining to juvenile records.), As Engrossed

HB431 by White, James (Relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine and recommend revisions to any state laws pertaining to juvenile records.), As Engrossed



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would require the Juvenile Justice Board to appoint a committee to develop a plan for studying, reorganizing, and revising relevant laws concerning juvenile justice records. The bill requires that the committee submit a report of recommendations to the legislature and the Juvenile Justice Board no later than November 1, 2016. The committee would be abolished December 31, 2018. This analysis assumes that the Juvenile Justice Department and the Department of Family and Protective Services could implement the provisions of the bill by utilizing existing resources. The bill would take effect immediately upon receiving a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each chamber, otherwise it would take effect September 1, 2015.

Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 644 Juvenile Justice Department

530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 644 Juvenile Justice Department

LBB Staff: UP, AG, ESi, AI, RCa

 UP, AG, ESi, AI, RCa