By: White of Tyler, Miles H.B. No. 431 (Senate Sponsor - RodrÃguez) (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015; April 27, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 6, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the creation of an advisory committee to examine and recommend revisions to any state laws pertaining to juvenile records. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act: (1) "Advisory committee" means the Juvenile Records Advisory Committee appointed under Section 2 of this Act. (2) "Board" means the Texas Juvenile Justice Board. SECTION 2. JUVENILE RECORDS ADVISORY COMMITTEE. Not later than December 1, 2015, the board shall appoint an advisory committee to develop a plan for studying, reorganizing, and comprehensively revising Chapter 58, Family Code, and any other relevant laws pertaining to juvenile records. SECTION 3. APPOINTMENTS; PRESIDING OFFICER. (a) In making appointments to the advisory committee, the board shall include members who are interested parties, including: (1) chief juvenile probation officers; (2) juvenile prosecutors; (3) juvenile defense attorneys; (4) juvenile court judges; (5) justice court or municipal court judges; (6) court administrators or court clerks; (7) peace officers; (8) representatives of the Department of Public Safety; (9) representatives of the Department of Family and Protective Services; (10) representatives of the Texas Juvenile Justice Department; (11) juvenile justice advocates; (12) individuals with expertise in federal records and federal immigration policy; (13) members of the public; and (14) any other individuals that the board considers necessary to accomplish the duties of the advisory committee. (b) The board shall designate one of the members as presiding officer of the advisory committee. SECTION 4. REPORT. (a) Not later than November 1, 2016, the advisory committee shall submit to the legislature and the board the recommendations for revisions to Chapter 58, Family Code, and any other relevant laws pertaining to juvenile records and a copy of the plan developed by the committee under Section 2 of this Act to produce those recommendations. (b) The advisory committee may submit: (1) preliminary recommendations at any time before submitting the report required under Subsection (a) of this section; and (2) follow-up recommendations at any time after submitting the report required under Subsection (a) of this section. SECTION 5. COMPENSATION. Members of the advisory committee serve without compensation and are not entitled to reimbursement for expenses. SECTION 6. APPLICATION OF LAWS GOVERNING ADVISORY COMMITTEES. The advisory committee is not subject to Chapter 2110, Government Code. SECTION 7. EXPIRATION DATE. The advisory committee is abolished and this Act expires December 31, 2018. SECTION 8. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *