Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB463 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 463
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 22, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1;
 May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 463 By:  Kolkhorst


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 HuffinesX
 EllisX
 FraserX
 GarciaX
 HallX
 HancockX
 KolkhorstX
 TaylorofCollinX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the ability to mow, bale, shred, or hoe material on a
 state highway right-of-way.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 202.059(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  In a county with a population of more than 10,000, if
 [If] the person requesting permission under Subsection (a) is not
 the owner of the real property adjacent to the right-of-way that is
 the subject of the request, the district engineer must first
 provide the owner of the property the option of mowing, baling,
 shredding, or hoeing material on the right-of-way before granting
 permission to another person.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *