Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB484 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Capriglione, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 484
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 484 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of a person to be a candidate for or
 holder of certain public elective offices.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 141.001, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  To be eligible to be a candidate for, or elected or
 appointed to, a public elective office in this state, a person must:
 (1)  be a United States citizen;
 (2)  be 18 years of age or older on the first day of the
 term to be filled at the election or on the date of appointment, as
 applicable;
 (3)  have not been determined by a final judgment of a
 court exercising probate jurisdiction to be:
 (A)  totally mentally incapacitated; or
 (B)  partially mentally incapacitated without the
 right to vote;
 (4)  have not been finally convicted of a felony from
 which the person has not been pardoned or otherwise released from
 the resulting disabilities;
 (5)  have resided continuously in the state for 12
 months and in the territory from which the office is elected for six
 months immediately preceding the following date:
 (A)  for a candidate whose name is to appear on a
 general primary election ballot, the date of the regular filing
 deadline for a candidate's application for a place on the ballot;
 (B)  for an independent candidate, the date of the
 regular filing deadline for a candidate's application for a place
 on the ballot;
 (C)  for a write-in candidate, the date of the
 election at which the candidate's name is written in;
 (D)  for a party nominee who is nominated by any
 method other than by primary election, the date the nomination is
 made; and
 (E)  for an appointee to an office, the date the
 appointment is made; [and]
 (6)  on the date described by Subdivision (5), be
 registered to vote in the territory from which the office is
 elected; and
 (7)  satisfy any other eligibility requirements
 prescribed by law for the office.
 (d)  Subsection (a)(6) does not apply to a member of the
 governing body of a district created under Section 52(b)(1) or (2),
 Article III, or Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 601, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 601.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 601.009.  ELECTED OFFICER MUST BE REGISTERED VOTER.
 (a) A person may not qualify for a public elective office unless
 the person is a registered voter.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply to an office for which the
 federal or state constitution prescribes exclusive qualification
 requirements.
 (c)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a member of the
 governing body of a district created under Section 52(b)(1) or (2),
 Article III, or Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 the eligibility and qualification requirements for a candidate or
 officer whose term of office will begin on or after the effective
 date of this Act. The eligibility and qualification requirements
 for a candidate or officer whose term of office will begin before
 the effective date of this Act are governed by the law in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *