84R1245 TSR-D By: Guillen H.B. No. 499 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the public transportation advisory committee. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 455.004(c), Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: (c) Members serve for staggered terms of six years, with the terms of three members expiring on February 1 of each odd-numbered year. A vacancy on the committee shall be filled in the same manner as the original appointment for that position [A member serves at the pleasure of the officer who appointed the member]. A member is not entitled to compensation for service on the committee but is entitled to reimbursement for reasonable expenses the member incurs in performing committee duties. SECTION 2. (a) The terms of the public transportation advisory committee members serving on the effective date of this Act expire January 31, 2017. (b) The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives each shall appoint three members to the committee, in accordance with Section 455.004, Transportation Code, as amended by this Act, for terms beginning February 1, 2017, with one member having a term expiring February 1, 2019, one member having a term expiring February 1, 2021, and one member having a term expiring February 1, 2023. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.