Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB499 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/12/2014

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R1245 TSR-D
 By: Guillen H.B. No. 499


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the public transportation advisory committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 455.004(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Members serve for staggered terms of six years, with the
 terms of three members expiring on February 1 of each odd-numbered
 year. A vacancy on the committee shall be filled in the same manner
 as the original appointment for that position  [A member serves at
 the pleasure of the officer who appointed the member].  A member is
 not entitled to compensation for service on the committee but is
 entitled to reimbursement for reasonable expenses the member incurs
 in performing committee duties.
 SECTION 2.  (a) The terms of the public transportation
 advisory committee members serving on the effective date of this
 Act expire January 31, 2017.
 (b)  The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives each shall appoint three members to the
 committee, in accordance with Section 455.004, Transportation
 Code, as amended by this Act, for terms beginning February 1, 2017,
 with one member having a term expiring February 1, 2019, one member
 having a term expiring February 1, 2021, and one member having a
 term expiring February 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.