Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB565 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 565


 AN ACT
 relating to powers of private toll project entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 362.102, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 362.102.  COMMISSION APPROVAL OF PRIVATE TURNPIKE OR
 TOLL PROJECT REQUIRED.  Notwithstanding any other provision of law,
 a private entity may not construct a privately owned turnpike or
 toll project that connects to a road, bridge, or highway in the
 state highway system unless the commission approves the private
 turnpike or toll project as provided by this subchapter. Before the
 commission may approve a private turnpike or toll project, the
 commission must hold a public meeting concerning the project in the
 region in which the project will be located.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 362, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 362.105 and 362.106 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 362.105.  USE OF EMINENT DOMAIN BY TOLL ROAD
 CORPORATION.  Notwithstanding Section 30, Chapter 766 (H.B. 749),
 Acts of the 72nd Legislature, Regular Session, 1991, a corporation
 that has the powers, rights, and privileges of a corporation
 created under former Chapter 11, Title 32, Revised Statutes, as
 that law existed on August 31, 1991, other than a corporation to
 which Section 431.073(c) applies, may not exercise the power of
 eminent domain granted under that former law.
 Sec. 362.106.  AGREEMENT WITH TOLL PROJECT ENTITY. (a) In
 this section, "toll project entity" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 372.001.
 (b)  A private toll project entity may enter into an
 agreement with a public toll project entity to finance, construct,
 maintain, or operate a toll road.
 SECTION 3.  Section 362.102, Transportation Code, as amended
 by this Act, does not affect a turnpike or toll project approved by
 the Texas Transportation Commission before the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 565 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 137, Nays 0, 3 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 565 on May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 1, 2
 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 565 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor